This case was last updated from Wakulla County Courts on 08/27/2022 at 23:34:36 (UTC).

CAMARENA, HILARIO ARTURO VS JORDAN, MICHELLE

Case Summary

On 07/29/2022 CAMARENA, HILARIO ARTURO filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against JORDAN, MICHELLE. This case was filed in Wakulla County Courts, Wakulla County Courthouse located in Wakulla, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SMITH, J LAYNE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    07/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • County, State:

    Wakulla, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SMITH, J LAYNE

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CAMARENA, HILARIO ARTURO

Respondent

JORDAN, MICHELLE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

BLACK, WILLIAM STEPHEN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/15/2022
  • DocketACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE AND WAIVER OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketOrder ON MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE--INJUNCTIONS 22-DR-99/100 CONSOLIDATED INTO THIS CASE. INJUNCTION IN EFFECT UNTIL FURTHER ORDER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketSTANDING FAMILY LAW ORDER 2020-09

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketJudge: SMITH , J LAYNE Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketMOTION TO ESTABLISH TEMPORARY PARENTING PLAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketPETITION TO DETERMINE PATERNITY & FOR RELATED RELIEF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketCOVER SHEET FOR FAMILY COURT CASES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $300.00 Receipt Number MX 2022005501

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $300.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketAttorney: for to HILARIO ARTURO CAMARENA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketCase 652022DR000288DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 7/29/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BLACK, WILLIAM STEPHEN