This case was last updated from Wakulla County Courts on 11/27/2021 at 12:01:54 (UTC).

AMERICREDIT FINANCIAL SERVICES VS BOYETTE, CYNTHIA LYNN

Case Summary

On 10/29/2021 AMERICREDIT FINANCIAL SERVICES filed an Other lawsuit against BOYETTE, CYNTHIA LYNN. This case was filed in Wakulla County Courts, Wakulla County Courthouse located in Wakulla, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are WALKER, JILL CONLON and WALKER, JILL C. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    10/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Wakulla, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

WALKER, JILL CONLON

WALKER, JILL C

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICREDIT FINANCIAL SERVICES

Defendant

BOYETTE, CYNTHIA LYNN

Not Classified By Court

COOPER, CYNTHIA L.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LEVINE, DENNIS JAY

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

10/29/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketOTHER PRE-JUDMENT WRIT OF REPLEVIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $10.00 Receipt Number MX 8261

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketAssessment 4 assessed at sum $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE EMAIL TO PLAINTIFF FOR THEM TO PROVIDE THE CLERK WITH A WRIT OF REPLEVIN FOR SIGNATURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketOrder DIRECTING CLERK TO ISSUE A WRIT OF REPLEVIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $8.50 Receipt Number MX 8159

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketREPLEVIN BOND WITH ATTACHED GENERAL POWER OF ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE LETTER FROM PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketAssessment 3 assessed at sum $8.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketRECEIPT OF EFT FOR FILING FEE THAT FAILED TO DROP INTO THE CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $385.00 Receipt Number MX 7663

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $85.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $485.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketCLERK NOTE (NON IMAGE) no summons filed at the time of filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketJudge: WALKER , JILL C Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketAttorney: for to AMERICREDIT FINANCIAL SERVICES INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketCase 652021CC000095CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 10/29/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERICREDIT FINANCIAL SERVICES INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DENNIS J LEVINE