This case was last updated from Washington County Courts on 09/04/2019 at 14:26:00 (UTC).

WELLS FARGO BANK NA VS GRIPPO, JAMIE L

Case Summary

On 08/05/2019 WELLS FARGO BANK NA filed an Other lawsuit against GRIPPO, JAMIE L. This case was filed in Washington County Courts, Washington County Courthouse located in Washington, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is PEEL, COLBY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    08/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Washington County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Washington County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Washington, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

PEEL, COLBY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WELLS FARGO BANK NA

Defendant

GRIPPO, JAMIE L

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NADERPOUR, AMIR

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/21/2019
  • RETURN OF SERVICE UNABLE TO SERVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TO JAMIE L GRIPPO - NOT FOUND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND/OR AN ACTION TO COLLECT A DEBT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • DESIGNATION OF EMAIL- ESERVICE1@NADERPOURLAW.COM AND ESERVICE2@NADERPOURLAW.COM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • ISSUED SUMMONS FOR JAMIE L GRIPPO- EMAILED TO ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • Payment received: $310.00 Receipt Number 19 19004378

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $310.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • Attorney: Assigned to WELLS FARGO BANK NA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • Case 672019CC000072CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 8/5/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer AMIR NADERPOUR