This case was last updated from Washington County Courts on 03/31/2021 at 16:37:25 (UTC).

US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION VS ZABELL, BRIAN Et Al

Case Summary

On 03/02/2021 US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ZABELL, BRIAN. This case was filed in Washington County Courts, Washington County Courthouse located in Washington, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are PEEL, COLBY and COLBY PEEL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Washington County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Washington County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Washington, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

PEEL, COLBY

COLBY PEEL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

Defendants

ZABELL, BRIAN

ZABELL, CYNTHIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

REECE, CARLA T

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/13/2021
  • HearingEvent Date: 04/13/2021 09:30; Judge: PEEL, COLBY; Docket Type: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: WASHINGTON COUNTY COURTHOUSE JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE TO CYNTHIA ZABELL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE TO BRIAN ZABELL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketEvent PRETRIAL CONFERENCE scheduled on 4/13/2021 at 0930 AM, CH - Judge COLBY PEEL presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $320.00 Receipt Number 21 2021001022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $320.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketAttorney: Assigned to US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketISSUED SUMMONS FOR BRIAN ZABELL- EMAILED TO ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketISSUED SUMMONS FOR CYNTHIA ZABELL- EMAILED TO ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $320.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketCase 672021SC000035SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 3/2/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where U.S. Bank, N.A. as Trustee for the RMAC Trust, Series 2016-CTT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer REECE ESQ, CARLA T