This case was last updated from Washington County Courts on 09/07/2019 at 16:36:17 (UTC).

PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INS CO VS DEAN, KAY SHARONE Et Al

Case Summary

On 08/08/2019 PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INS CO filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against DEAN, KAY SHARONE. This case was filed in Washington County Courts, Washington County Courthouse located in Washington, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are COLBY PEEL and PEEL, COLBY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    08/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Washington County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Washington County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Washington, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

COLBY PEEL

PEEL, COLBY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INS CO

Defendants

DEAN, KELVIN KAY SHARONE

DEAN, KAY SHARONE

Not Classified By Court

JR, KELVIN DEAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MARKCITY, MICHAEL RAYMOND

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/04/2019
  • RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TO KELVIN KAY SHARHONE DEAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TO KAY SHARHONE DEAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TO KAY SHARHONE DEAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • ORDER GRANTING TELEPHONE APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • Event PRETRIAL CONFERENCE scheduled on 9/13/2019 at 0900 AM, CH - Judge COLBY PEEL presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • MOTION TO ALLOW TELEPHONE APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 08/08/2019
  • ISSUED SUMMONS FOR KAY SHARHONE DEAN- EMAILED TO ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • DESIGNATION OF EMAIL - ESERVICE@MRCLAWYER.COM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • Payment received: $320.00 Receipt Number 19 19004457

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $320.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $320.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • Attorney: Assigned to PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INS CO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • Case 672019SC000122SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 8/8/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • Event Date: 09/13/2019 09:00; Judge: PEEL, COLBY; Docket Type: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: CH COUNTY COURTROOM

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Progressive American Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Markcity, Michael Raymond