This case was last updated from Washington County Courts on 09/11/2019 at 16:35:36 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES VS BARRON, JUSTIN B

Case Summary

On 08/12/2019 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against BARRON, JUSTIN B. This case was filed in Washington County Courts, Washington County Courthouse located in Washington, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are COLBY PEEL and PEEL, COLBY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Washington County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Washington County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Washington, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

COLBY PEEL

PEEL, COLBY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES

Defendant

BARRON, JUSTIN B

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PERAZA, MANUEL ALEJANDRO

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/22/2019
  • RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TO JUSTIN BARRON- SUBSTITUTE SERVICE AT USUAL PLACE OF ABODE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • Order Allowing Telephonic Appearance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • Event PRETRIAL CONFERENCE scheduled on 9/13/2019 at 0900 AM, CH - Judge COLBY PEEL presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • DESIGNATION OF EMAIL LEGALPLEADINGS@POLLACKROSEN.COM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • ISSUED SUMMONS FOR JUSTIN B BARRON- EMAILED TO ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • MOTION FOR TELEPHONICE APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • Payment received: $310.00 Receipt Number 19 19004539

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $310.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • Attorney: Assigned to PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • Case 672019SC000137SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 8/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • Event Date: 09/13/2019 09:00; Judge: PEEL, COLBY; Docket Type: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: CH COUNTY COURTROOM

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PERAZA , MANUEL