This case was last updated from Washington County Courts on 03/31/2021 at 16:37:36 (UTC).

NOLIN PROPERTIES LLC VS HORIZON HEALTH CARE SERVICES I

Case Summary

On 03/02/2021 NOLIN PROPERTIES LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against HORIZON HEALTH CARE SERVICES I. This case was filed in Washington County Courts, Washington County Courthouse located in Washington, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is PEEL, COLBY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Washington County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Washington County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Washington, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

PEEL, COLBY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NOLIN PROPERTIES LLC

Defendant

HORIZON HEALTH CARE SERVICES I

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NOLIN, NATHAN GARRETT

 

Court Documents

AFFIDAVIT

03/02/2021:AFFIDAVIT

COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT

03/02/2021:COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF ACTION- EMAILED TO ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $175.00 Receipt Number 21 2021001021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $175.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketAttorney: Assigned to NOLIN PROPERTIES LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketEXHIBIT VIHICLE IDENTIFICATION NUMBER AND ODOMETER VERIFICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $175.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketCase 672021SC000034SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 3/2/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HORIZON HEALTH CARE SERVICES I is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer NOLIN, NATHAN GARRETT