This case was last updated from Fourteenth Circuit Courts - Washington Courts on 07/13/2019 15:32:25

Get the Latest Court Record Available:

Case Summary

On 06/13/2019 a Other case was filed by NOLANDS ROOFING INC AAO RUBEN against UNIVERSAL PROPERTY CASUALTY IN in the jurisdiction of Fourteenth Circuit Courts - Washington Courts, Washington County Courthouse located in Washington, Florida.

Case Details

  • Case Number ****************AXMX
  • Filing Date 06/13/2019
  • Case Status Pending - Other Pending
  • Case Type Other
  • Jurisdiction Fourteenth Circuit Courts - Washington Courts
  • Judge REGISTER, TIMOTHY
  • Courthouse Washington County Courthouse
  • County Washington
  • State Florida

Party Details

  • Plaintiff NOLANDS ROOFING INC AAO RUBEN
  • Defendant UNIVERSAL PROPERTY CASUALTY IN

Court Documents

COMPLAINT KATIE@HHJLEGAL.COM

06/13/2019:COMPLAINT KATIE@HHJLEGAL.COM

Free with Subscription
CIVIL COVER SHEET

06/13/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

Free with Subscription

Docket Entries

  • 07/08/2019
  • MOTION TO STRIKE/MOTION FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT
  • 07/03/2019
  • MOTION TO DISMISS COUNT II OF PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT
  • 07/03/2019
  • ANSWER/COUNTER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO COUNT 1 OF PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT
  • 06/21/2019
  • NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES UPCICESERVICE04@UNIVERSALPROPERTY.COM
  • 06/21/2019
  • Defendant Attorney: SCOTT C FRANKEL ESQ Assigned to UNIVERSAL PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
  • 06/17/2019
  • RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY SERVED
  • 06/14/2019
  • Payment received: $400.00 Receipt Number 19 19003355
  • 06/14/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $400.00 Balance Remaining $0.00
  • 06/14/2019
  • Judge: Assigned
  • 06/14/2019
  • Attorney: Assigned to NOLANDS ROOFING INC AAO RUBEN LAUREL
  • 06/13/2019
  • ISSUED SUMMONS FOR UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY EMAILD TO ATTORNEY
  • 06/13/2019
  • REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT
  • 06/13/2019
  • NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT
  • 06/13/2019
  • COMPLAINT KATIE@HHJLEGAL.COM
  • 06/13/2019
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET
  • 06/13/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00
  • 06/13/2019
  • Case 672019CA000097CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 6/13/2019

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.