This case was last updated from Washington County Courts on 08/11/2019 at 17:36:22 (UTC).

MOORER, GABRIEL J, PEOPLES, DESTINY Et Al

Case Summary

On 07/12/2019 MOORER, GABRIEL J, PEOPLES, DESTINY was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Washington County Courts, Washington County Courthouse located in Washington, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are REGISTER, TIMOTHY and DAVID JOHNSON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    07/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Washington County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Washington County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Washington, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

REGISTER, TIMOTHY

DAVID JOHNSON

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court

MOORER, GABRIEL J

PEOPLES, DESTINY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/06/2019
  • Event DISSOLUTION scheduled on 8/26/2019 at 1000 AM, CH - Judge DAVID JOHNSON presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • NOTICE OF HEARING BEFORE GENERAL MAGISTRATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • ORDER OF REFERRAL TO GENERAL MAGISTRATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • STANDING FAMILY LAW PRE-TRAIL COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • PRE-TRIAL CATALOGUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • MARITAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT FOR SIMPLIFIED DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER ------> Wife

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECUIRTY NUMBER ------> Husband

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • DOH DEMOGRAHIC INFORMATION SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • FL DRIVER LICENSE ------> Wife

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 07/12/2019
  • NOTICE OF LIMITATIONS OF SERVICES PROVIDED ------> Wife

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • NOTICE OF LIMITATIONS OF SERVICES PROVIDED ------> Husband

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • DISCLOSURE FORM NONLAWYER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • COVER SHEET FOR FAMILY COURT CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • Payment received: $397.50 Receipt Number 19 19003942

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $397.50 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • COVER SHEET FOR FAMILY COURT CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $397.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • Case 672019DR000226DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 7/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • Judge: REGISTER , TIMOTHY assigned

    Read MoreRead Less