This case was last updated from Fourteenth Circuit Courts - Washington Courts on 07/16/2020 at 12:08:32 (UTC).

MITCHELL, EDWIN Et Al VS H AND T CONTRACTORS LLC Et Al

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 MITCHELL, EDWIN filed an Other lawsuit against H AND T CONTRACTORS LLC. This case was filed in Fourteenth Circuit Courts - Washington Courts, Washington County Courthouse located in Washington, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are REGISTER, TIMOTHY and REGISTER, TIMOTHY ALLEN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Fourteenth Circuit Courts - Washington Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Washington County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Washington, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

REGISTER, TIMOTHY

REGISTER, TIMOTHY ALLEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MITCHELL, PETER

MITCHELL, EDWIN

MITCHELL, MELANIE

Defendants

THOMAS, MARTEENAS

H AND T CONTRACTORS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SUNDBERG, WILLIAM LESTER

 

Court Documents

ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

01/07/2020:ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR MARTEENAS K THOMAS EMAILED TO ATTORNEY

12/05/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR MARTEENAS K THOMAS EMAILED TO ATTORNEY

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/24/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY/NON-PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY/NON-PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF PROCUCTION FROM NON-PARTY/NON-PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF MEDIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS' RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S, PETER MITCHELL, NOTICE OF SERVING UNVERIFIED ANSWERS TO DEFENDANT'S FIRST INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S, MELANIE MITCHELL, NOTICE OF SERVING UNVERIFIED ANSWERS TO DEFENDANT'S FIRST INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S, EDWIN MITCHELL, NOTICE OF SERVING UNVERIFIED ANSWERS TO DEFENDANT'S FIRST INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FOR MARTEENAS K THOMAS EMAILED TO ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketPayment received: $420.00 Receipt Number 19 19006604

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $420.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $420.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketAttorney: Assigned to MELANIE MITCHELL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketAttorney: Assigned to EDWIN MITCHELL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketAttorney: Assigned to PETER MITCHELL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketCase 672019CA000223CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 12/5/2019

    Read MoreRead Less