This case was last updated from Washington County Courts on 09/04/2019 at 14:25:33 (UTC).

FINCH, DANIEL VS LANGFORD, JENNIFER Et Al

Case Summary

On 08/05/2019 FINCH, DANIEL filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against LANGFORD, JENNIFER. This case was filed in Washington County Courts, Washington County Courthouse located in Washington, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is PEEL, COLBY. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    08/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Washington County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Washington County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Washington, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

PEEL, COLBY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FINCH, DANIEL

Defendants

UNKNOWN TENANTS,

LANGFORD, JENNIFER

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/28/2019
  • RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TO JENNIFER LANGFORD- POSTED RESIDENTIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • Case Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION- SENT TO S.O. WITH $90 CHECK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • Payment received: $8.00 Receipt Number 19 19004567

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • Assessment 9 Total Assessed $8.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • Assessment 9 assessed at sum $8.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • ORDER FOR TENANT REMOVAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • MOTION FOR TENANT REMOVAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • MOTION FOR CLERK'S DEFAULT/ CLERK'S DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • NONMILITARY AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 08/05/2019
  • Assessment 2 Total Assessed $10.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $185.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • Assessment 5 Total Assessed $6.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • Assessment 5 assessed at sum $6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • Assessment 4 assessed at sum $6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • Assessment 3 assessed at sum $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • Assessment 2 assessed at sum $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • Case 672019CC000035LTAXMX Filed with Clerk on 8/5/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • Judge: PEEL , COLBY assigned

    Read MoreRead Less