This case was last updated from Washington County Courts on 09/05/2019 at 14:25:53 (UTC).

CAMPBELL, JACQUELYN GWEN VS HOGUE, JAZMYN

Case Summary

On 08/06/2019 CAMPBELL, JACQUELYN GWEN filed an Other lawsuit against HOGUE, JAZMYN. This case was filed in Washington County Courts, Washington County Courthouse located in Washington, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is PEEL, COLBY. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    08/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Washington County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Washington County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Washington, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

PEEL, COLBY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAMPBELL, JACQUELYN GWEN

Defendants

HOGUE, JAZMYN

CAMPBELL HOGUE, JAZMYN SHANAE

 

Court Documents

FINAL JUDGMENT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER

08/19/2019:FINAL JUDGMENT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/28/2019
  • RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TO JAZMYN SHANE CAMPBELL HOGUE- POSTED RESIDENTIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • Case Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • Payment received: $8.00 Receipt Number 19 19004642

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • Assessment 4 Total Assessed $8.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • Assessment 4 assessed at sum $8.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION--SENT TO S.O. WITH $90 CHECK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • FINAL JUDGMENT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • MOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • MOTION FOR CLERK'S DEFAULT/ DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 08/06/2019
  • COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • Payment received: $316.00 Receipt Number 19 19004415

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • Assessment 3 Total Assessed $6.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • Assessment 2 Total Assessed $10.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $300.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • Assessment 3 assessed at sum $6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • Assessment 2 assessed at sum $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • Case 672019CC000074CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 8/6/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • Judge: PEEL , COLBY assigned

    Read MoreRead Less