This case was last updated from Fourteenth Circuit Courts - Washington Courts on 07/08/2021 at 15:32:46 (UTC).

ASI PREFERRED INSURANCE COMPAN VS GUIDEONE ELITE INSURANCE COMPA

Case Summary

On 06/08/2021 ASI PREFERRED INSURANCE COMPAN filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against GUIDEONE ELITE INSURANCE COMPA. This case was filed in Fourteenth Circuit Courts - Washington Courts, Washington County Courthouse located in Washington, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are REGISTER, TIMOTHY ALLEN and REGISTER, TIMOTHY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    06/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Washington, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

REGISTER, TIMOTHY ALLEN

REGISTER, TIMOTHY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ASI PREFERRED INSURANCE COMPAN

Defendant

GUIDEONE ELITE INSURANCE COMPA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HERNDON, JOHN EDWARD

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

06/08/2021:COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE -SERVED ON DEE GAVIN AS AGENCY CLERK FOR GUIDEONE ELITE INSURANCE/JOHN HERNDON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $410.00 Receipt Number 21 2021003230

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $410.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketAttorney: Assigned to ASI PREFERRED INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketADMINISTRATIVE ORDER #2021-00-06 RE: CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT WITH EXHIBIT A: STANDING CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FOR GUIDEONE ELITE INSURANCE COMPANY-EMAILED TO ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketCase 672021CA000042CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 6/8/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GuideOne Elite Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where ASI PREFERRED INSURANCE CORP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JOHN EDWARD HERNDON