This case was last updated from First Circuit Courts - Walton County on 02/11/2021 at 00:28:44 (UTC).

YOLO BOARD LLC VS BROUWER, NATHAN Et Al

Case Summary

On 11/04/2015 YOLO BOARD LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against BROUWER, NATHAN. This case was filed in First Circuit Courts - Walton County, Walton County Courthouse located in Walton, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are GREEN, DAVID W and GREEN, DAVID WALKER. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    11/04/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Walton, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

GREEN, DAVID W

GREEN, DAVID WALKER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

YOLO BOARD LLC

Defendants

LEWIS, BRIAN

BROUWER, NATHAN

OPEN AIR DYNAMICS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SMITH, BRIAN EDWARD

Defendant Attorney

MCCLOY, DIXON ROSS

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF REMOVAL

12/22/2015:NOTICE OF REMOVAL

NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL

12/22/2015:NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES OF DIXON ROSS MCCLOY, JR. FOR OPEN AIR DYNAMICS, LLC; NATHAN BROUWER; BRIAN LEWIS

12/15/2015:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES OF DIXON ROSS MCCLOY, JR. FOR OPEN AIR DYNAMICS, LLC; NATHAN BROUWER; BRIAN LEWIS

PROOF OF SERVICE TO BRIAN LEWIS ON 11/24/15

12/10/2015:PROOF OF SERVICE TO BRIAN LEWIS ON 11/24/15

PROOF OF SERVICE TO OPEN AIR DYNAMICS, LLC ON 11/24/15

12/10/2015:PROOF OF SERVICE TO OPEN AIR DYNAMICS, LLC ON 11/24/15

SUMMONS ISSUED TO: BRIAN LEWIS

11/20/2015:SUMMONS ISSUED TO: BRIAN LEWIS

SUMMONS ISSUED TO: NATHAN BROUWER

11/20/2015:SUMMONS ISSUED TO: NATHAN BROUWER

SUMMONS ISSUED TO: OPEN AIR DYNAMICS, LLC

11/20/2015:SUMMONS ISSUED TO: OPEN AIR DYNAMICS, LLC

UNSIGNED SUMMONS TO BRIAN LEWIS

11/20/2015:UNSIGNED SUMMONS TO BRIAN LEWIS

UNSIGNED SUMMONS TO NATHAN BROUWER

11/20/2015:UNSIGNED SUMMONS TO NATHAN BROUWER

UNSIGNED SUMMONS TO OPEN AIR DYNAMICS, LLC

11/20/2015:UNSIGNED SUMMONS TO OPEN AIR DYNAMICS, LLC

COMPLAINT

11/04/2015:COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET;

11/04/2015:CIVIL COVER SHEET;

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF REMOVAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES OF DIXON ROSS MCCLOY, JR. FOR OPEN AIR DYNAMICS, LLC; NATHAN BROUWER; BRIAN LEWIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE TO BRIAN LEWIS ON 11/24/15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE TO OPEN AIR DYNAMICS, LLC ON 11/24/15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO: BRIAN LEWIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO: NATHAN BROUWER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO: OPEN AIR DYNAMICS, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUNSIGNED SUMMONS TO BRIAN LEWIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUNSIGNED SUMMONS TO NATHAN BROUWER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUNSIGNED SUMMONS TO OPEN AIR DYNAMICS, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET;

    Read MoreRead Less