This case was last updated from First Circuit Courts - Walton County on 10/27/2019 at 14:30:32 (UTC).

WYNDHAM VACATION RESORTS INC VS BRADSHAW, DELORES S Et Al

Case Summary

On 10/03/2019 WYNDHAM VACATION RESORTS INC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against BRADSHAW, DELORES S. This case was filed in First Circuit Courts - Walton County, Walton County Courthouse located in Walton, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GREEN, DAVID W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    10/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    First Circuit Courts - Walton County

  • Courthouse:

    Walton County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Walton, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GREEN, DAVID W

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WYNDHAM VACATION RESORTS INC

Defendants

BRADSHAW, SILAS L

BRADSHAW, DELORES S

MAJESTIC SUN VACATION OWNERS A

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/24/2019
  • PROOF OF SERVICE TO SILAS BRADSHAW 10-18-19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • PROOF OF SERVICE TO DELORES S BRADSHAW 10-18-19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO: MAJESTIC SUN VACATION OWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO: DELORES S BRADSHAW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO: SILAS L BRADSHAW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • UNSIGNED SUMMONS TO MAJESTIC SUN VACATION OWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC C/O CORPORATE CREATION NETWORK, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • UNSIGNED SUMMONS TO DELORES S BRADSHAW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • UNSIGNED SUMMONS TO SILAS L BRADSHAW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY/MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED: $439.00 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 122607

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • ASSESSMENT 1 ASSESSED AT SUM $439.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc. is a litigant