This case was last updated from Walton County Courts on 06/14/2022 at 04:14:13 (UTC).

WEST, KEANTHONY VS LINDSEY, NANCY

Case Summary

On 08/23/2021 WEST, KEANTHONY filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against LINDSEY, NANCY. This case was filed in Walton County Courts, South Walton County Courthouse located in Walton, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WELLS, KELVIN CLYDE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • County, State:

    Walton, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WELLS, KELVIN CLYDE

 

Party Details

Petitioner

WEST, KEANTHONY

Respondent

LINDSEY, NANCY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/31/2022
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE TO NANCY LINDSEY 03/30/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT OF INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION AGAINST DOMESTIC VIOLENCE WITHOUT MINOR CHILD(REN) (AFTER NOTICE)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketMAIL RETURNED UNDELIVERED ON KEANTHNY WEST

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE TO NANCY LINDSEY ON 10/15/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketAMENDED TEMPORARY JUDGMENT OF INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION AGAINST DOMESTIC VIOLENCE WITHOUT MINOR CHILD(REN) (AFTER NOTICE)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE TO NANCY LINDSEY 9-1-21

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketTEMPORARY INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION AGAINST DOMESTIC VIOLENCE WITHOUT MINOR CHILD(REN)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE TO NANCY LINDSEY 8-24-21

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketORDER SETTING HEARING ON PETITION FOR INJUNCTION AGAINST DOMSTIC VIOLENCE HEARING SET 09/01/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketSHERIFF INFORMATION SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketPHOTO IDENTIFICATION FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketRESTRAINING ORDER QUESTIONNAIRE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR INJUNCTION AGAINST DOMESTIC VIOLENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less