This case was last updated from Walton County - First Judicial Circuit Court on 09/06/2022 at 09:29:24 (UTC).

WALTON PLANTATION MASTER ASSOC VS HAHN, CYNTHIA A Et Al

Case Summary

On 04/20/2015 WALTON PLANTATION MASTER ASSOC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against HAHN, CYNTHIA A. This case was filed in Walton County - First Judicial Circuit Court, Walton County Courthouse located in Walton, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GREEN, DAVID WALKER. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    04/20/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Walton, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GREEN, DAVID WALKER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WALTON PLANTATION MASTER ASSOC

Defendants

HAHN, CYNTHIA A

WELCH, TENIELLE S

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KAUFFMAN, ROBERT LEE

 

Court Documents

ORDER OF CONTEMPT AND COMMITMENT;

06/29/2016:ORDER OF CONTEMPT AND COMMITMENT;

ORDER VACATING ORDER OF CONTEMPT AND COMMITMENT;

07/19/2016:ORDER VACATING ORDER OF CONTEMPT AND COMMITMENT;

FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT

09/11/2015:FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT

MAIL RETURNED UNDELIVERED (TENIELLE SHEREE WELCH)

07/06/2016:MAIL RETURNED UNDELIVERED (TENIELLE SHEREE WELCH)

PROPOSED ORDER OF CONTEMPT AND COMMITMENT

06/20/2016:PROPOSED ORDER OF CONTEMPT AND COMMITMENT

PROPOSED WRIT OF BODILY ATTACHMENT

06/20/2016:PROPOSED WRIT OF BODILY ATTACHMENT

NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT

06/20/2016:NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT

LETTER TO JUDGE GREEN FROM DUNLAP & SHIPMAN, PA DATED 6/16/16

06/20/2016:LETTER TO JUDGE GREEN FROM DUNLAP & SHIPMAN, PA DATED 6/16/16

ORDER ON THE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

05/13/2016:ORDER ON THE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

LETTER TO JUDGE GREEN FROM ANNA G COTHRAN DATED 5/9/16

05/09/2016:LETTER TO JUDGE GREEN FROM ANNA G COTHRAN DATED 5/9/16

PROOF OF SERVICE TO TENIELLE SHEREE WELCH ON 5/2/16

05/04/2016:PROOF OF SERVICE TO TENIELLE SHEREE WELCH ON 5/2/16

PROOF OF SERVICE TO CYNTHIA . HAHN ON 4/26/16

05/04/2016:PROOF OF SERVICE TO CYNTHIA . HAHN ON 4/26/16

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ON CYNTHIA A HAHN ON 04/26/16

05/02/2016:AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ON CYNTHIA A HAHN ON 04/26/16

NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT

05/02/2016:NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT

2ND AMENDED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AS TO TENIELLE SHEREE WELCH

04/11/2016:2ND AMENDED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AS TO TENIELLE SHEREE WELCH

2ND AMENDED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AS TO CYNTHIA A HAUN

04/11/2016:2ND AMENDED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AS TO CYNTHIA A HAUN

AMENDED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AS TO CYNTHIA S HAHN;

03/14/2016:AMENDED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AS TO CYNTHIA S HAHN;

AMENDED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AS TO TENIELLE SHEREE WELCH;

03/14/2016:AMENDED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AS TO TENIELLE SHEREE WELCH;

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER VACATING ORDER OF CONTEMPT AND COMMITMENT;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2016
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ORDER VACATING ORDER OF CONTEMPT & COMMITMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMAIL RETURNED UNDELIVERED (TENIELLE SHEREE WELCH)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER OF CONTEMPT AND COMMITMENT;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED ORDER OF CONTEMPT AND COMMITMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED WRIT OF BODILY ATTACHMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2016
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER TO JUDGE GREEN FROM DUNLAP & SHIPMAN, PA DATED 6/16/16

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ON THE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 05/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE TO TENIELLE SHEREE WELCH ON 4/21/15

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE TO CYNTHIA A. HAHN ON 4/30/15

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2015
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVITS OF SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2015
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO: CYNTHIA A HAHN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2015
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO: TENIELLE SHIREE WELCH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2015
  • DocketUNSIGNED SUMMONS ISSUED TO CYNTHIA A HAHN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2015
  • DocketUNSIGNED SUMMONS ISSUED TO TENIELLE SHIREE WELCH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2015
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2015
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer KAUFFMAN, ROBERT LEE