This case was last updated from First Circuit Courts - Walton County on 11/07/2019 at 14:32:20 (UTC).

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA VS CITY OF DEFUNIAK SPRINGS, FLOR Et Al

Case Summary

On 10/14/2019 UNITED STATES OF AMERICA filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against CITY OF DEFUNIAK SPRINGS, FLOR. This case was filed in First Circuit Courts - Walton County, Walton County Courthouse located in Walton, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is LEWIS, JEFFREY E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    10/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    First Circuit Courts - Walton County

  • Courthouse:

    Walton County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Walton, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

LEWIS, JEFFREY E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Defendants

MANNING, THE ESTATE OF EUGENE

WALTON COUNTY

HOOKS, JOHN

MANNING, TWILLA E

CITY OF DEFUNIAK SPRINGS, FLOR

MANNING, THE ESTATE OF BESSIE

OCCUPANTS, UNKNOWN

DUBOISE, THELMA

MANNING, MARILYN T

MANNING, THE ESTATE OF WILLA M

HOOKS, ORTHEOLA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VILABOA-ABEL, CHRISTINA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/24/2019
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO: WALTON COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO: ORTHEOLA HOOKS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO: UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO: MARILYN T MANNING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO: TWILLA E MANNING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO: CITY OF DFS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO: THELMA DUBOISE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO: JOHN HOOKS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • UNSIGNED SUMMONS TO WALTON COUNTY BOCC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • UNSIGNED SUMMONS TO UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 10/23/2019
  • UNSIGNED SUMMONS TO MARILYN T MANNING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • UNSIGNED SUMMONS TO JOHN HOOKS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • UNSIGNED SUMMONS TO CITY OF DFS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED: $80.00 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 123305

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • ASSESSMENT 2 ASSESSED AT SUM $80.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE COMPLAINT AND ATTACHMENTS;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED: $434.00 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 123231

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • ASSESSMENT 1 ASSESSED AT SUM $434.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WALTON COUNTY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer VILABOA ABEL , CHRISTINA