This case was last updated from First Circuit Courts - Walton County on 11/08/2019 at 14:31:00 (UTC).

TRUST, SUN VS KATZ, ROBERT

Case Summary

On 10/15/2019 TRUST, SUN filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against KATZ, ROBERT. This case was filed in First Circuit Courts - Walton County, Walton County Courthouse located in Walton, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is LEWIS, JEFFREY E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    10/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    First Circuit Courts - Walton County

  • Courthouse:

    Walton County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Walton, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

LEWIS, JEFFREY E

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

TRUST, SUN

SUN TRUST BANK

Defendant

KATZ, ROBERT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WINARSKY, AMY JILL

 

Court Documents

RECORDED COPY IN BOOK 4716 PAGE 1803 FOR ALACHUA COUNTY - ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO TRANSFER CASE.

10/15/2019:RECORDED COPY IN BOOK 4716 PAGE 1803 FOR ALACHUA COUNTY - ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO TRANSFER CASE.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/01/2019
  • ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED TO: ROBERT KATZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED: $10.00 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 123603

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • ASSESSMENT 2 ASSESSED AT SUM $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • UNSIGNED ALIAS SUMMONS TO ROBERT KATZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED: $400.00 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 122977

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • ASSESSMENT 1 ASSESSED AT SUM $400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • RECEIPT OF TRANSFER FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • LETTER TO CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • COVER LETTER FROM MARCADIS LAW WITH FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • LETTER REQUESTING TRANSFER FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 10/15/2019
  • MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF SEVICE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NOT SERVED ON ROBERT KATZ ON 04/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • ORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • SUMMONS TO DEFENDANT FILED. ROBERT KATZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RECORDED COPY IN BOOK 4716 PAGE 1803 FOR ALACHUA COUNTY - ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO TRANSFER CASE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • CASE HISTORY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • COVER LETTER FROM ALACHU COUNTY CLERK OF COURT DATED 10/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SUN TRUST BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Winarsky, Amy Jill