Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Walton County Courts on 07/22/2019 at 17:01:24 (UTC).

TKACHENKO, VALERIA VS BOGDAN, KOVALOV

Case Summary

On 06/28/2019 TKACHENKO, VALERIA filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against BOGDAN, KOVALOV. This case was filed in Walton County Courts, South Walton County Courthouse located in Walton, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WELLS, KELVIN C. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    06/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Walton County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    South Walton County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Walton, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WELLS, KELVIN C

 

Party Details

Petitioner

TKACHENKO, VALERIA

Respondent

BOGDAN, KOVALOV

Not Classified By Court

TKACHENKO, VALERIIA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/15/2019
  • AFFIDAVIT OF CORROBORATING WITNESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER OF BOGDAN KOVALOV

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER OF VALERIIA TKACHENKO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • AGREEMENT TO WAIVE RECEIPT OF GENERAL MAGISTRATE REPORT AND EXCEPTION PERIOD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • NOTICE OF HEARING ON 8/19/19 @ 9:00 AM CST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF NOTICE OF LIMITATION OF SERVICES PROVIDED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • FAMILY LAW STANDING PRETRIAL ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • ORDER OF REFERRAL TO GENERAL MAGISTRATE - CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • PHOTO IDENTIFICATION FILED: WIFE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • PHOTO IDENTIFICATION FILED: HUSBAND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • PARTIES' INFORMATION SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • AFFIDAVIT OF CORROBORATING WITNESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • NOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • MARITAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT SIGNED BY BOTH PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • PETITION FOR SIMPLIFIED DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • COVER SHEET FOR FAMILY COURT CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED: $408.00 RECEIPT NUMBER AX 26457

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • ASSESSMENT 1 ASSESSED AT SUM $408.00

    Read MoreRead Less