This case was last updated from Walton County - First Judicial Circuit Court on 03/23/2019 at 22:37:24 (UTC).

THE ENCLAVE AT INLET BEACH OWN VS BECKER & POLIAKOFF, PA Et Al

Case Summary

On 11/24/2014 THE ENCLAVE AT INLET BEACH OWN filed a Contract - Professional Negligence lawsuit against BECKER POLIAKOFF, PA. This case was filed in Walton County - First Judicial Circuit Court, Walton County Courthouse located in Walton, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are LEWIS, JEFFREY E and SANTURRI, THOMAS R. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    11/24/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Professional Negligence

  • County, State:

    Walton, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

LEWIS, JEFFREY E

SANTURRI, THOMAS R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THE ENCLAVE AT INLET BEACH OWN

Defendants

CONERLY, LAMAR A JR

BECKER & POLIAKOFF, PA

SHULER, JENNIFER WINTRODE ESQU

SHOEMAKER, LILLOUS A ESQUIRE

NEWMAN, RAYMOND F JR

ROBERTS, JAY ESQUIRE

TOWNSEND, JOHN P ESQUIRE

LAW OFFICES OF LAMAR A CONERLY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DAVEY, BRIAN

Defendant Attorneys

SIMPSON, MARY KATHERINE

PARKER, JAMES KNIGHT

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL;

11/24/2014:COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL;

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF DEFENANTS LAMAR A. CONERLY, JR., LILLOUS A. SHOEMAKER, JENNIFER WINTRODE SHULER, AND LAW OFFICES OF LAMAR A. CONERLY, P.A.

01/30/2015:ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF DEFENANTS LAMAR A. CONERLY, JR., LILLOUS A. SHOEMAKER, JENNIFER WINTRODE SHULER, AND LAW OFFICES OF LAMAR A. CONERLY, P.A.

MOTION TO DISMISS

01/30/2015:MOTION TO DISMISS

PLAINTIFF'S REPLY TO DEFENDANTS LAMAR A. CONERLY, KR., LILLOUS A. SHOEMAKER, JENNIFER WINTRODE SHULER, AND LAW OFFICES OF LAMAR A. CONERLY, P.A.'S AFFIRMATIVE DEFEFNSES

02/04/2015:PLAINTIFF'S REPLY TO DEFENDANTS LAMAR A. CONERLY, KR., LILLOUS A. SHOEMAKER, JENNIFER WINTRODE SHULER, AND LAW OFFICES OF LAMAR A. CONERLY, P.A.'S AFFIRMATIVE DEFEFNSES

DEFENDANT, LAW OFFICES OF LAMAR A. CONERLY, P.A.'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLAINTIF

02/27/2015:DEFENDANT, LAW OFFICES OF LAMAR A. CONERLY, P.A.'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLAINTIF

DEFENDANT, LAW OFFICES OF LAMAR A. CONERLY, P.A.'S NOTICE OF SERVICING FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

02/27/2015:DEFENDANT, LAW OFFICES OF LAMAR A. CONERLY, P.A.'S NOTICE OF SERVICING FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO DEFENDANT LAW OFFICES OF LAMAR A. CONERLY, P.A.'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

04/10/2015:PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO DEFENDANT LAW OFFICES OF LAMAR A. CONERLY, P.A.'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT, LAW OFFICES OF LAMAR A. CONERLY, P.A.'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLAINTIFF

04/10/2015:PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT, LAW OFFICES OF LAMAR A. CONERLY, P.A.'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLAINTIFF

BECKER & POLIAKOFF, P.A., RAYMOND NEWMAN, JOHN TOWNSEND AND JAY ROBERTS' REQUEST FOR COPIES.

04/13/2015:BECKER & POLIAKOFF, P.A., RAYMOND NEWMAN, JOHN TOWNSEND AND JAY ROBERTS' REQUEST FOR COPIES.

ORDER OF RECUSAL

04/14/2015:ORDER OF RECUSAL

NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

07/27/2015:NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF CHANGE IN FIRM NAME

03/17/2016:DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF CHANGE IN FIRM NAME

ANSWER , AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, AND COUNTERCLAIM

04/06/2018:ANSWER , AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, AND COUNTERCLAIM

PLAINTIFF'S ANSWER TO DEFENDANT BECKER & POLIAKOFF, P.A.'S COUNTERCLAIM

04/16/2018:PLAINTIFF'S ANSWER TO DEFENDANT BECKER & POLIAKOFF, P.A.'S COUNTERCLAIM

PLAINTIFF'S REPLY TO DEFENDANTS, BECKER & POLIAKOFF, P.A. RAYMOND NEWMAN, JR., JOHN P. TOWNSEND, AND JAY ROBERTS' AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

04/16/2018:PLAINTIFF'S REPLY TO DEFENDANTS, BECKER & POLIAKOFF, P.A. RAYMOND NEWMAN, JR., JOHN P. TOWNSEND, AND JAY ROBERTS' AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/08/2018
  • DocketCONERLY DEFENDANTS' SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • DocketBECKER & POLIAKOFF, P.A., RAYMOND NEWMAN, JOHN TOWNSEND AND JAY ROBERTS' REQUEST FOR COPIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • DocketBECKER & POLIAKOFF, P.A., RAYMOND NEWMAN, JOHN TOWNSEND AND JAY ROBERTS' REQUEST FOR COPIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • DocketAMENDED NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTIES;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING ON OCTOBER 2, 2018 @ 10:30

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • DocketCONERLY DEFENDANTS' RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • DocketAMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF DEFENDANT, JENNIFER WINTRODE SHULER, ESQUIRE SET FOR AUGUST 13, 2018 @ 10:00 AM CST

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • DocketAMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF DEFENDANT, LAMARA A CONERLY, JR, ESQUIRE SET FOR AUGUST 13, 2018 @ 2:00 PM CST

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
41 More Docket Entries
  • 11/24/2014
  • DocketUNSIGNED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/24/2014
  • DocketUNSIGNED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/24/2014
  • DocketUNSIGNED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/24/2014
  • DocketUNSIGNED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/24/2014
  • DocketUNSIGNED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/24/2014
  • DocketUNSIGNED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/24/2014
  • DocketUNSIGNED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/24/2014
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/24/2014
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Becker & Poliakoff P A is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Davey, Brian