This case was last updated from First Circuit Courts - Walton County on 02/11/2021 at 00:27:48 (UTC).

STEPHENS, ELTON B JR VS WALTON COUNTY

Case Summary

On 05/09/2007 STEPHENS, ELTON B JR filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against WALTON COUNTY. This case was filed in First Circuit Courts - Walton County, Walton County Courthouse located in Walton, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are GREEN, DAVID W and GREEN, DAVID WALKER. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    05/09/2007

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • County, State:

    Walton, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

GREEN, DAVID W

GREEN, DAVID WALKER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STEPHENS, ELTON B JR

Defendant

WALTON COUNTY

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF;LP

05/09/2007:COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF;LP

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/05/2010
  • DocketORDER OF DISMISSAL; MDB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2010
  • DocketORDER AND NOTICE OF HEARING ON 10/4/10 AT 3:30 PM;TM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2010
  • DocketNOTICE OF LACK OF PROSECUTION:KD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2009
  • DocketNOTICE; JMK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2008
  • DocketTO DEFENDANT SEAGROVE AT THE BEACH, LLC;RS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2008
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES DIRECTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2008
  • DocketDEFENDANT, SEAGROVE AT THE BEACH, LLC'S OBJECTIONS TO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2008
  • DocketAT THE BEACH, LLC; JMK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2008
  • DocketINTERROGATORIES DIRECTED TO DEFENDANT SEAGROVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2008
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS' FIRST SET OF

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 05/16/2007
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE TO WALTON COUNTY ON 5/11/07; JMK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2007
  • Docket5/11/07; JMK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2007
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE TO SEAGROVE AT THE BEACH, LLC ON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2007
  • DocketLETTER TO CLERK FROM LINDA S VORBECK, DATED 5/9/07; LP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2007
  • DocketTO COURIER; LP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2007
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FOR SEAGROVE AT THE BEACH LLC AND RETURNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2007
  • DocketCOURIER; LP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2007
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FOR WALTON COUNTY, FLORIDA AND RETURNED TO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF;LP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2007
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; LP

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WALTON COUNTY is a litigant