This case was last updated from Walton County Courts on 09/23/2021 at 04:24:55 (UTC).

SPICER, JEFFREY VS EVANS, SHONDA

Case Summary

On 01/25/2021 SPICER, JEFFREY filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against EVANS, SHONDA. This case was filed in Walton County Courts, South Walton County Courthouse located in Walton, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is LEWIS, JEFFREY EDWARD. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    01/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • County, State:

    Walton, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

LEWIS, JEFFREY EDWARD

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SPICER, JEFFREY

Respondent

EVANS, SHONDA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED: $12.00 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 139414

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketASSESSMENT 2 ASSESSED AT SUM $12.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketSUPERVISED/SAFETY FOCUSED PARENTING PLAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketANSWER TO PETITION TO ESTABLISH TIMESHARING WITH CHILD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE TO SHONDRA RASHEELE EVANS ON 02/01/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketORDER TO ATTEND DEPARTMENT OF CHILDREN AND FAMILIES APPROVED PARENT EDUCATION AND STABILIZATION COURSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketORDER OF REFERRAL TO FAMILY MEDIATION UNIT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO: SHONDA EVANS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF CIVIL INDIGENT STATUS- APPROVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF CIVIL INDIGENT STATUS (APPROVED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketPHOTO IDENTIFICATION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketACKNOWLEDGMENT OF NOTICE OF LIMITATION OF SERVICES PROVIDED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketPARENTING PLAN;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketUNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION ENFORCEMENT AFFIDAVIT (UCCJEA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketPETITION TO ESTABLISH TIMESHARING WITH CHILD(REN)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketCOVER SHEET FOR FAMILY COURT CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 ASSESSED AT SUM $410.00

    Read MoreRead Less