Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from First Circuit Courts - Walton County on 10/25/2019 at 14:34:20 (UTC).

SHAW, BETTY Et Al VS GULF SHORE SOUTH ASSOCIATION L Et Al

Case Summary

On 10/01/2019 SHAW, BETTY filed an Other lawsuit against GULF SHORE SOUTH ASSOCIATION L. This case was filed in First Circuit Courts - Walton County, Walton County Courthouse located in Walton, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is LEWIS, JEFFREY E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    10/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    First Circuit Courts - Walton County

  • Courthouse:

    Walton County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Walton, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

LEWIS, JEFFREY E

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SHAW, JEFFREY

SHAW, BETTY

Defendants

WSLT LCC TRUSTEE COASTAL RESOU

WATSON, FRANK

WATSON SEWELL PL

GULF SHORE SOUTH ASSOCIATION L

HOWARD, SELETA HAYES

SEWELL, KIMBERLY WATSON

HOWARD, PETER J

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FRY, MEGAN FORTSON

Defendant Attorneys

TRAYLOR, DARRYL STEVE

SEWELL, KIMBERLY WATSON

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

10/01/2019:COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/24/2019
  • NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESSES DESIGNATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • ACCEPTANCE AND WAIVER OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • ACCEPTANCE AND WAIVER OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO: FRANK WATSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO: SELETA HOWARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO: PETER J HOWARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO: GULF SHORE SOUTH ASSOCIATION LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO: KIMBERLY WATSON SEWELL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO: WATSON SEWELL PL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO: WSLT LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 10/01/2019
  • UNSIGNED SUMMONS TO FRANK WATSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • UNSIGNED SUMMONS TO PETER J HOWARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • UNSIGNED SUMMONS TO SELETA HOWARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • UNSIGNED SUMMONS TO GULF SHORE SOUTH ASSOCIATION LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • UNSIGNED SUMMONS TO KIMBERLY WATSON SEWELL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • UNSIGNED SUMMONS TO WATSON SEWELL PL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • UNSIGNED SUMMONS TO WSLT LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GULF SHORE SOUTH ASSOCIATION L is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MEGAN F FRY