This case was last updated from First Circuit Courts - Walton County on 02/11/2021 at 00:28:28 (UTC).

SE PROPERTY HOLDINGS LLC VS ANY UNKNOWN PARTIES IN POSSESS Et Al

Case Summary

On 06/09/2014 SE PROPERTY HOLDINGS LLC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against ANY UNKNOWN PARTIES IN POSSESS. This case was filed in First Circuit Courts - Walton County, Walton County Courthouse located in Walton, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SANTURRI, THOMAS R. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    06/09/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Walton, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SANTURRI, THOMAS R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SE PROPERTY HOLDINGS LLC

Defendants

ANY UNKNOWN PARTIES IN POSSESS

JD V OF NORTHWEST FLORIDA INC

JACOBS, PAMELA

JACOBS, DAVID C

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CROSSLAND, BRANDON THOMAS

Defendant Attorney

STRATTON, JOHN MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

JOINT STIPULATION TO FINAL JUDGMENT AGAINST JD&V OF NORTHWEST FLORIDA, INC

01/12/2016:JOINT STIPULATION TO FINAL JUDGMENT AGAINST JD&V OF NORTHWEST FLORIDA, INC

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING (1/20/16 AT 1:30 PM)

01/11/2016:NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING (1/20/16 AT 1:30 PM)

FINAL JUDGMENT

01/11/2016:FINAL JUDGMENT

PROPOSED FINAL JUDGMENT

01/08/2016:PROPOSED FINAL JUDGMENT

LETTER TO JUDGE SANTURRI FROM BAKER HOSTETLER DATED 01/08/16

01/08/2016:LETTER TO JUDGE SANTURRI FROM BAKER HOSTETLER DATED 01/08/16

JOINT STIPULATION TO FINAL JUDGMENT AGAINST JD&V OF NORTHWEST FLORIDA, INC

01/07/2016:JOINT STIPULATION TO FINAL JUDGMENT AGAINST JD&V OF NORTHWEST FLORIDA, INC

NOTICE OF HEARING ON 01.20.2016 AT 1:30 PM

11/04/2015:NOTICE OF HEARING ON 01.20.2016 AT 1:30 PM

PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

10/28/2015:PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

ORDER ON MOTIONS

09/08/2015:ORDER ON MOTIONS

PROPOSED ORDER

09/04/2015:PROPOSED ORDER

NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES

08/17/2015:NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES

JD& V OF NORTHWEST FLORIDA, INC'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION

08/17/2015:JD& V OF NORTHWEST FLORIDA, INC'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION

DEFENDANT, JD & V OF NORTHWEST FLORIDA, INC'S REPLY TO FIRST SET OF REQUESTS FOR ADMISSIONS

08/17/2015:DEFENDANT, JD & V OF NORTHWEST FLORIDA, INC'S REPLY TO FIRST SET OF REQUESTS FOR ADMISSIONS

PLAINTIFF'S, SE PROPERTY HOLDINGS, LLC, NOTICE OF SERVICE OF FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT, JD & V OF NORTHWEST FLORIDA, INC.

07/13/2015:PLAINTIFF'S, SE PROPERTY HOLDINGS, LLC, NOTICE OF SERVICE OF FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT, JD & V OF NORTHWEST FLORIDA, INC.

PLAINTIFF'S, SE PROPERTY HOLDINGS, LLC FIRST SET OF REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT, JD & V OF NORTHWEST FLORIDA, INC.

07/13/2015:PLAINTIFF'S, SE PROPERTY HOLDINGS, LLC FIRST SET OF REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT, JD & V OF NORTHWEST FLORIDA, INC.

PLAINTIFF'S, SE PROPERTY HOLDINGS, LLC, FIRST SET OF REQUESTS FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT, JD & V OF NORTHWEST FLORIDA, INC.

07/13/2015:PLAINTIFF'S, SE PROPERTY HOLDINGS, LLC, FIRST SET OF REQUESTS FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT, JD & V OF NORTHWEST FLORIDA, INC.

NOTICE OF ACTION

06/27/2014:NOTICE OF ACTION

PROOF OF NONSERVICE ON ANY UNKNOWN PARTIES;

06/25/2014:PROOF OF NONSERVICE ON ANY UNKNOWN PARTIES;

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJOINT STIPULATION TO FINAL JUDGMENT AGAINST JD&V OF NORTHWEST FLORIDA, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING (1/20/16 AT 1:30 PM)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED FINAL JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER TO JUDGE SANTURRI FROM BAKER HOSTETLER DATED 01/08/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJOINT STIPULATION TO FINAL JUDGMENT AGAINST JD&V OF NORTHWEST FLORIDA, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING ON 01.20.2016 AT 1:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ON MOTIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
66 More Docket Entries
  • 06/10/2014
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO: ANY UNKNOWN PARTIES IN POSSESSION OF THE SUBJECT PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2014
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO: PAMELA JACOBS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2014
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO: DAVID C JACOBS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2014
  • DocketUNSIGNED SUMMONS TO ANY UNKNOWN PARTIES IN POSSESSION OF THE SUBJECT PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2014
  • DocketUNSIGNED SUMMONS TO PAMELA JACOBS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2014
  • DocketUNSIGNED SUMMONS TO DAVID C JACOBS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2014
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2014
  • DocketVERIFIED COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2014
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2014
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SE PROPERTY HOLDINGS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer STRATTON, JOHN MICHAEL