This case was last updated from First Circuit Courts - Walton County on 02/11/2021 at 00:28:23 (UTC).

SE PROPERTY HOLDINGS, LLC AN O Et Al VS BLACK, DAVID C Et Al

Case Summary

On 11/01/2007 SE PROPERTY HOLDINGS, LLC AN O filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against BLACK, DAVID C. This case was filed in First Circuit Courts - Walton County, Walton County Courthouse located in Walton, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are WHITE, WILLIAM P, LEWIS, JEFFREY E and LEWIS, JEFFREY EDWARD. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    11/01/2007

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Walton, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

WHITE, WILLIAM P

LEWIS, JEFFREY E

LEWIS, JEFFREY EDWARD

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Not Classified By Court

SE PROPERTY HOLDINGS, LLC AN O

VISION BANK

Defendants

KRENKEL, ANDREW J

MACLIN, HENRY W III

BLACK, DAVID C

WILLIS, KRENKEL, MACLIN &

WILLIS, RONALD D SR

VILLAS LAND, LLC

WILLIS, KRENKEL & MACLIN

Garnishee

WILLIS PROPERTIES LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

WHITTON, JEFFREY PAT

DURKIN, DENIS L

Garnishee Attorney

MCGILL, ROBERT EDGAR

 

Court Documents

MOTION FOR WRIT OF GARNISHMENT AFTER JUDGMENT (UNION STATE BANK)

02/10/2020:MOTION FOR WRIT OF GARNISHMENT AFTER JUDGMENT (UNION STATE BANK)

PETITION TO CANCEL A JUDGMENT;

02/14/2013:PETITION TO CANCEL A JUDGMENT;

COMPLAINT; SB

11/01/2007:COMPLAINT; SB

LETTER FROM THE CLERK TO BAKER & HOSTETLER, LLP

09/14/2017:LETTER FROM THE CLERK TO BAKER & HOSTETLER, LLP

AMENDED CORRECTED NOTICE OF AUTOMATIC DISSOLUTION OF WRIT OF GARNISHMENT PURSUANT TO 77.07(5) FLORIDA STATUES

11/16/2016:AMENDED CORRECTED NOTICE OF AUTOMATIC DISSOLUTION OF WRIT OF GARNISHMENT PURSUANT TO 77.07(5) FLORIDA STATUES

NOTICE OF AUTOMATIC DISSOLUTION OF GARNISHMENT (WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.)

11/08/2016:NOTICE OF AUTOMATIC DISSOLUTION OF GARNISHMENT (WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketREOPENED FOR CIVIL OTHER ON 2/10/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketANSWER OF GARNISHEE WILLIS PROPERTIES, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketANSWER OF GARNISHEE AND DEMAND TO PLAINITFF FOR PAYMENT OF ATTORNEY'S FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF MOTION FOR WRIT OF GARNISHMENT AFTER JUDGMENT, WRIT OF GARNISHMENT, AND NOTICE TO DEFENDANT OF RIGHT AGAINST GARNISHMENT OF WAGES, MONEY AND OTHER PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF MOTION FOR WRIT OF CONTINUING GARNISHMENT AFTER JUDGMENT, WRIT OF CONTINUING GARNISHMENT, AND NOTICE TO DEFENDANT OF RIGHT AGAINST GARNISHMENT OF WAGES, MONEY AND OTHER PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketREOPEN CIVIL OTHER CLOSED ON 2/18/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketREOPEN CIVIL OTHER CLOSED ON 2/18/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketREOPEN CIVIL OTHER CLOSED ON 2/18/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketWRIT OF GARNISHMENT - BANK OF AMERICA

    Read MoreRead Less
376 More Docket Entries
  • 11/01/2007
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO ANDREW J. KRENKEL; SB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2007
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO DAVID C. BLACK; SB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2007
  • Docket, LLC; SB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2007
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO WILLIS, KRENKEL, MACLIN & BLACK PROPERTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2007
  • DocketSB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2007
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO WILLIS, KRENKEL & MACLIN PROPERTIES, LLC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2007
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO VILLAS LAND, LLC; SB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; SB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2007
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS; SB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2007
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; SB

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WILLIS PROPERTIES, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Vision Bank is a litigant

Latest cases where SE PROPERTY HOLDINGS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCGILL, ROBERT EDGAR