This case was last updated from First Circuit Courts - Walton County on 02/11/2021 at 00:31:00 (UTC).

SE PROPERTY HOLDINGS, LLC, AN Et Al VS BANCORPSOUTH BANK Et Al

Case Summary

On 02/11/2009 SE PROPERTY HOLDINGS, LLC, AN filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against BANCORPSOUTH BANK. This case was filed in First Circuit Courts - Walton County, Walton County Courthouse located in Walton, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is RASMUSSEN, PAUL A. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    02/11/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Walton, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

RASMUSSEN, PAUL A

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

VISION BANK

SE PROPERTY HOLDINGS, LLC, AN

Defendants

BISHOPS LANDINGS HOMEOWNERS AS

WESTCOAST LENDING GROUP, INC

BANCORPSOUTH BANK

BISHOPS LANDINGS, LLC

CARRABELLE LANDINGS, LLC

STOKES, SCOTT

DOZER CONSTRUCTION OF FLORIDA

BOGGUS, J DONALD

D&B AQUISITIONS, LLC

CARRABELLE LANDINGS HOMEOWNERS

STOKES, BARBARA J

BOGUS, JENNIFER

Not Classified By Court

BOGUS, DONALD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

DURKIN, DENIS L

MURRAY, KELLI ANNE

Defendant Attorneys

RUSHING, ROBERT STERLING

GILMORE, ROBERT A.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/15/2014
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF (NO) DISBURSEMENTS (PARCEL 3 - LOT 101)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2014
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF (NO) DISBURSEMENTS (PARCEL 2 - LOT 100)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2014
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF (NO) DISBURSEMENTS (PARCEL 1)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2014
  • DocketLETTER TO CLERK FROM BAKERHOSTETLER; SCS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2014
  • DocketCOPY OF CERTIFICATE OF TITLE (PARCEL 3 - LOT 101)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2014
  • DocketCOPY OF CERTIFICATE OF TITLE (PARCEL 2 - LOT 100)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2014
  • DocketCOPY OF CERTIFICATE OF TITLE (PARCEL 1)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2014
  • DocketCOPY OF JUDICIAL SALE AND/OR ESALE CHECK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2014
  • DocketCOVER LETTER BAKERHOSTLER DATED 02-04-14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2014
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF SALE; PARCEL 3

    Read MoreRead Less
150 More Docket Entries
  • 02/11/2009
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO BISHOPS LANDINGS, LLC; TP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2009
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO CARRABELLE LANDINGS, LLC; TP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2009
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO DOZER CONSTRUCTION; TP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2009
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO BARBARA J. STOKES; TP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2009
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO SCOTT STOKES; TP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2009
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO J. DONALD BOGGUS; TP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2009
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO JENNIFER BOGGUS; TP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2009
  • DocketFORECLOSURE COMPLAINT; TP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2009
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS; TP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2009
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; TP

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Vision Bank is a litigant

Latest cases where BISHOP LANDING HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC is a litigant

Latest cases where BancorpSouth Bank is a litigant

Latest cases where SE PROPERTY HOLDINGS LLC is a litigant