This case was last updated from First Circuit Courts - Walton County on 11/01/2019 at 14:31:08 (UTC).

REGIONS BANK VS BAYTOWNE WHARD NEIGHBORHOOD AS Et Al

Case Summary

On 10/08/2019 REGIONS BANK filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against BAYTOWNE WHARD NEIGHBORHOOD AS. This case was filed in First Circuit Courts - Walton County, Walton County Courthouse located in Walton, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GREEN, DAVID W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    10/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    First Circuit Courts - Walton County

  • Courthouse:

    Walton County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Walton, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GREEN, DAVID W

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

REGIONS BANK

Defendants

LE JARDIN AT BAYTOWNE WHARF CO

BAYTOWNE WHARD NEIGHBORHOOD AS

RANKINE, DAVID A

GATEWAY AT BAYTOWNE WHARF COND

TENANT, UNKNOWN

RANKINE, KATHERINE J

SANDESTIN OWNERS ASSOCIATION I

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA INTER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WHITE, LESLIE SINGLETERRY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/31/2019
  • AFFIDAVIT/RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TO SANDESTIN OWNERS ASSOCIATION INC 10-24-19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • AFFIDAVIT/RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TO LE JARDIN AY BAYTOWNE WHARF CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION INC 10-24-19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • AFFIDAVIT/RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TO BAYTOWNE WHARF NEIGHBORHOOD ASSOCIATION INC 10-24-19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2019
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO: UNKNOWN TENANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2019
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO: LE JARDIN AT BAYTOWNE WHARF CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2019
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO: BAYTOWNE WHARF NEIGHBORHOOD ASSOCIATION, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2019
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO: GATEWAY AT BAYTOWNE WHARF CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2019
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO: KATHERINE J RANKINE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2019
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO: SANDESTIN OWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2019
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 10/11/2019
  • AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY/MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • CERTIFICATION OF POSSESSION OF ORIGINAL PROMISSORY NOTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED: $2,006.50 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 122790

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • ASSESSMENT 1 ASSESSED AT SUM $2,006.50

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SANDESTIN OWNERS ASSOCIATION I is a litigant

Latest cases where Regions Bank is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer White, Leslie S