This case was last updated from Walton County - First Judicial Circuit Court on 03/23/2019 at 20:08:40 (UTC).

REGIONS BANK DBA REGIONS MORTG VS LUAU CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION I Et Al

Case Summary

On 07/15/2014 REGIONS BANK DBA REGIONS MORTG filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against LUAU CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION I. This case was filed in Walton County - First Judicial Circuit Court, Walton County Courthouse located in Walton, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GREEN, DAVID W. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Walton, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GREEN, DAVID W

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

REGIONS BANK DBA REGIONS MORTG

Defendants

UNKNOWN TENANT 1

LUAU CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION I

UNKNOWN TENANT 2

VANCE, MYETTA

SANDESTIN OWNERS ASSOCIATION I

VANCE, VERCELL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NEUMAN, ROD BARRETT

Defendant Attorneys

KAUFFMAN, ROBERT LEE

SMITH, PARKER BENTLEY

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF SALE

06/19/2015:NOTICE OF SALE

PROPOSED NOTICE OF SALE;

07/14/2015:PROPOSED NOTICE OF SALE;

PROPOSED AMENDED ORDER RESCHEDULING FORECLOSURE SALE OF 07/21/15

07/15/2015:PROPOSED AMENDED ORDER RESCHEDULING FORECLOSURE SALE OF 07/21/15

AMENDED ORDER RESCHEDULING FORECLOSURE SALE OF JULY 21, 2015

07/17/2015:AMENDED ORDER RESCHEDULING FORECLOSURE SALE OF JULY 21, 2015

NOTICE OF SALE 8/21/15

07/17/2015:NOTICE OF SALE 8/21/15

EMAIL CONFIRMATION FROM DEFUNIAK HERALD

07/23/2015:EMAIL CONFIRMATION FROM DEFUNIAK HERALD

PROOF OF PUBLICATION

08/04/2015:PROOF OF PUBLICATION

FORECLOSURE SALE BID LOG;

08/21/2015:FORECLOSURE SALE BID LOG;

CERTIFICATE OF SALE;

08/21/2015:CERTIFICATE OF SALE;

COVER LETTER FROM THE OFFICE OF GIBBONS AND NEUMAN DATED 08/24/15

08/31/2015:COVER LETTER FROM THE OFFICE OF GIBBONS AND NEUMAN DATED 08/24/15

COPY OF JUDICIAL SALE AND/OR ESALE CHECK

08/31/2015:COPY OF JUDICIAL SALE AND/OR ESALE CHECK

COPY OF CHECK FOR DOC STAMPS

08/31/2015:COPY OF CHECK FOR DOC STAMPS

CERTIFICATE OF TITLE

09/01/2015:CERTIFICATE OF TITLE

CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS

09/03/2015:CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF TITLE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOPY OF CHECK FOR DOC STAMPS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOPY OF JUDICIAL SALE AND/OR ESALE CHECK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER LETTER FROM THE OFFICE OF GIBBONS AND NEUMAN DATED 08/24/15

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF SALE;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFORECLOSURE SALE BID LOG;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF PUBLICATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEMAIL CONFIRMATION FROM DEFUNIAK HERALD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SALE 8/21/15

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
75 More Docket Entries
  • 07/15/2014
  • DocketUNSIGNED SUMMONS TO VERCELL VANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2014
  • DocketCERTIFICATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2014
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2014
  • DocketVALUE OF REAL PROPERTY/MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE FORM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2014
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2014
  • DocketVERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR FORECLOSURE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2014
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2015
  • DocketReopen Date: 07/15/2015; Reopen Close Date: 07/17/2015; Reopen Reason: Other reason

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2015
  • DocketReopen Date: 06/17/2015; Reopen Close Date: 06/19/2015; Reopen Reason: Other reason

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2015
  • DocketReopen Date: 02/27/2015; Reopen Close Date: 03/03/2015; Reopen Reason: Modification

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SANDESTIN OWNERS ASSOCIATION I is a litigant

Latest cases where Regions Bank is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KAUFFMAN, ROBERT LEE

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SMITH, PARKER BENTLEY