This case was last updated from Walton County - First Judicial Circuit Court on 08/20/2022 at 14:38:30 (UTC).

REGIONS BANK D B A REGIONS MOR VS SIES, TIMOTHY LANG Et Al

Case Summary

On 07/22/2022 REGIONS BANK D B A REGIONS MOR filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against SIES, TIMOTHY LANG. This case was filed in Walton County - First Judicial Circuit Court, Walton County Courthouse located in Walton, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are GREEN, DAVID WALKER and GREEN, DAVID W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    07/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Walton, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

GREEN, DAVID WALKER

GREEN, DAVID W

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

REGIONS BANK D B A REGIONS MOR

Defendants

WEBB, VANETTE H

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA DEPAR

WEBB, JAMES D

WEBB, VANETTE

SIES, TIMOTHY LANG

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF JAMES D WEBB

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF VANETTE H WE

UNKNOWN TENANT 1

UNKNOWN TENANT 2

SRB WINDSOR ESTATES HOMEOWNERS

THE UNKNOWN BENEFICIARIES OF T

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROSENBERG, ANNA JUDD

 

Court Documents

CEASE AND DESIST LETTER ON A BUSINESS ENTITY

08/04/2022:CEASE AND DESIST LETTER ON A BUSINESS ENTITY

SUMMONS ISSUED TO: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY - INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE

07/25/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED TO: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY - INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE

SUMMONS ISSUED TO: SRB WINDSOR ESTATES HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC,

07/25/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED TO: SRB WINDSOR ESTATES HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC,

SUMMONS ISSUED TO: UNKNOWN TENANT 1

07/25/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED TO: UNKNOWN TENANT 1

SUMMONS ISSUED TO: UNKNOWN TENANT 2

07/25/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED TO: UNKNOWN TENANT 2

SUMMONS ISSUED TO: UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF VANETTE H. WEBB A/K/A VANETTE HUNDLEY WEBB

07/25/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED TO: UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF VANETTE H. WEBB A/K/A VANETTE HUNDLEY WEBB

SUMMONS ISSUED TO: UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF JAMES D WEBB A/K/A JAMES D. WEBB, III

07/25/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED TO: UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF JAMES D WEBB A/K/A JAMES D. WEBB, III

SUMMONS ISSUED TO: TIMOTHY LANG SIES, AS TRUSTEE OF THE TETELESTAI TRUST

07/25/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED TO: TIMOTHY LANG SIES, AS TRUSTEE OF THE TETELESTAI TRUST

SUMMONS ISSUED TO: VANETTE H. WEBB A/K/A VANETTE HUNDLEY WEBB

07/25/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED TO: VANETTE H. WEBB A/K/A VANETTE HUNDLEY WEBB

SUMMONS ISSUED TO: VANETTE H. WEBB A/K/A VANETTE HUNDLEY WEBB, AS TRUSTEE OF THE TETELESTAI TRUST

07/25/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED TO: VANETTE H. WEBB A/K/A VANETTE HUNDLEY WEBB, AS TRUSTEE OF THE TETELESTAI TRUST

SUMMONS ISSUED TO: JAMES D WEBB A/K/A JAMES D. WEBB, III

07/25/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED TO: JAMES D WEBB A/K/A JAMES D. WEBB, III

UNSIGNED SUMMONS - UNKNOWN TENANT 2

07/25/2022:UNSIGNED SUMMONS - UNKNOWN TENANT 2

UNSIGNED SUMMONS - TIMOTHY LANG SIES, AS TRUSTEE OF THE TETELESTAI TRUST

07/25/2022:UNSIGNED SUMMONS - TIMOTHY LANG SIES, AS TRUSTEE OF THE TETELESTAI TRUST

UNSIGNED SUMMONS - VANETTE H. WEBB A/K/A VANETTE HUNDLEY WEBB, AS TRUSTEE OF THE TETELESTAI TRUST

07/25/2022:UNSIGNED SUMMONS - VANETTE H. WEBB A/K/A VANETTE HUNDLEY WEBB, AS TRUSTEE OF THE TETELESTAI TRUST

UNSIGNED SUMMONS - VANETTE H. WEBB A/K/A VANETTE HUNDLEY WEBB

07/25/2022:UNSIGNED SUMMONS - VANETTE H. WEBB A/K/A VANETTE HUNDLEY WEBB

UNSIGNED SUMMONS - JAMES D WEBB A/K/A JAMES D. WEBB, III

07/25/2022:UNSIGNED SUMMONS - JAMES D WEBB A/K/A JAMES D. WEBB, III

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

07/25/2022:NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

VERIFIED COMPLAINT TO FORECLOSE MORTGAGE

07/25/2022:VERIFIED COMPLAINT TO FORECLOSE MORTGAGE

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/12/2022
  • DocketDEFENDANT UNITED STATES OF AMERICA'S DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESSES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • DocketANSWER OF DEFENDANT, UNITED STATE OF AMERICA ON BEHALF OF THE INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCEASE AND DESIST LETTER ON A BUSINESS ENTITY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO: THE UNKNOWN BENEFICIARIES OF THE TETELESTAI TRUST

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY - INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO: SRB WINDSOR ESTATES HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO: UNKNOWN TENANT 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO: UNKNOWN TENANT 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO: UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF VANETTE H. WEBB A/K/A VANETTE HUNDLEY WEBB

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO: UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF JAMES D WEBB A/K/A JAMES D. WEBB, III

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUNSIGNED SUMMONS - VANETTE H. WEBB A/K/A VANETTE HUNDLEY WEBB, AS TRUSTEE OF THE TETELESTAI TRUST

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUNSIGNED SUMMONS - VANETTE H. WEBB A/K/A VANETTE HUNDLEY WEBB

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUNSIGNED SUMMONS - JAMES D WEBB A/K/A JAMES D. WEBB, III

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketCERTIFICATION OF POSSESSION OF ORIGINAL PROMISSORY NOTE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketVALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVERIFIED COMPLAINT TO FORECLOSE MORTGAGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED: $1,050.00 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 162094

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 ASSESSED AT SUM $1,050.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Regions Bank is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROSENBERG, ANNA JUDD