This case was last updated from First Circuit Courts - Walton County on 08/11/2020 at 14:16:12 (UTC).

RAILTON, KRISTIN MICHELE VS FUENTES VELASQUEZ, EMERSON ANT Et Al

Case Summary

On 01/15/2020 RAILTON, KRISTIN MICHELE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against FUENTES VELASQUEZ, EMERSON ANT. This case was filed in First Circuit Courts - Walton County, Walton County Courthouse located in Walton, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are LEWIS, JEFFREY E and LEWIS, JEFFREY EDWARD. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    01/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Walton, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

LEWIS, JEFFREY E

LEWIS, JEFFREY EDWARD

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RAILTON, KRISTIN MICHELE

Defendants

HINOJOSA GARCIA, JOSE RAFAEL

FUENTES VELASQUEZ, EMERSON ANT

UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BROWNING, COY HOWARD

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

01/15/2020:COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketORDER OF DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketANSWER , AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE TO JOSE REFAEL HINOJOSA GARCIA 1-28-2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON EMERSON ANTONIO FUENTES VELASQUEZ ON 01/23/2020 TOWIT KAREN HINOJOSA (WIFE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS. UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION SERVED ON 1/21/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO: EMERSON ANTONIO FUENTES VELASQUEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO: JOSE RAFAEL HINOJOSA GARCIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO: UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketUNSIGNED SUMMONS TO EMERSON ANTONIO FUENTES VELASQUEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketUNSIGNED SUMMONS TO JOSE RAFAEL HINOJOSA GARCIA

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT USAA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANTS JOSE RAFAEL HINOJOSA GARCIAS AND EMERSON ANTONIO FUENTES VELASQUEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED: $430.00 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 126142

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 ASSESSED AT SUM $430.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASS is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BROWNING, COY HOWARD