This case was last updated from Walton County Courts on 06/14/2022 at 04:12:37 (UTC).

PRATT, SHANE THOMAS VS CLAY PRATT, JODI SUZANNE

Case Summary

On 08/27/2021 PRATT, SHANE THOMAS filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against CLAY PRATT, JODI SUZANNE. This case was filed in Walton County Courts, South Walton County Courthouse located in Walton, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WELLS, KELVIN CLYDE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    08/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Walton, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WELLS, KELVIN CLYDE

 

Party Details

Petitioner

PRATT, SHANE THOMAS

Respondent

CLAY PRATT, JODI SUZANNE

Not Classified By Court

CLAY, JODI SUZANNE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED: $56.00 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 157702

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketASSESSMENT 2 ASSESSED AT SUM $56.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketCHILD SUPPORT AGREEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIMITATION OF SERVICE PROVIDED AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketSPECIAL AFFIDAVIT FOR UNCONTESTED DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT FOR UNCONTESTED DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketUNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION ENFORCEMENT AFFIDAVIT (UCCJEA)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketFAMILY LAW STANDING PRETRIAL ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketORDER TO ATTEND DEPARTMENT OF CHILDREN AND FAMILIES APPROVED PARENT EDUCATION AND STABILIZATION COURSE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH MANDATORY DISCLOSURE: HUSBAND

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketUNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION ENFORCEMENT AFFIDAVIT (UCCJEA)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketSHARED PARENTING PLAN SIGNED BY BOTH PARTIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketMARITAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT SIGNED BY BOTH PARTIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH DEPENDENT OR MINOR CHILD(REN)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketFAMILY MEDIATION INCOME VERIFICATION AFFIDAVIT - 2 PEOPLE - MORE THAN $50,000

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketCOVER SHEET FOR FAMILY COURT CASES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED: $408.00 RECEIPT NUMBER AX 31100

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 ASSESSED AT SUM $408.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less