This case was last updated from First Circuit Courts - Walton County on 11/10/2020 at 18:59:29 (UTC).

POOLE, VAN B VS FLORIDA COMMUNITY SERVICES COR Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/28/2020 POOLE, VAN B filed an Other lawsuit against FLORIDA COMMUNITY SERVICES COR. This case was filed in First Circuit Courts - Walton County, Walton County Courthouse located in Walton, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are GREEN, DAVID WALKER and GREEN, DAVID W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    09/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Walton, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

GREEN, DAVID WALKER

GREEN, DAVID W

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

POOLE, VAN B

Defendants

UTILITY SERVICES ASSOCIATES LL

FLORIDA COMMUNITY SERVICES COR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ZAMORA, DARIAN LOUISE

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

09/28/2020:COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE MOTION FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketDEFENDANT UTILITY SERVICES ASSOCIATES LLC'S MOTION TO DISMISS AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT THEREOF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE TO UTILITY SERVICES ASSOCIATES (OF ALABAMA), LLC ON 10/8/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE TO FLORIDA COMMUNITY SERVICES CORPORATION OF WALTON COUNTY ON 10/13/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO: FL COMMUNITY SERVICES CORPORATION OF WALTON COUNTY (REGIONAL UTILITIES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO: UTILITY SERVICES ASSOCIATES (OF ALABAMA) LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED: $420.00 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 134907

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 ASSESSED AT SUM $420.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketUNSIGNED SUMMONS TO UTILITY SERVICES ASSOCIATION (OF ALABAMA) LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketUNSIGNED SUMMONS TO FL COMMUNITY SERVICES CORPORATION OF WALTON COUNTY (REGIONAL UTILITIES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FLORIDA COMMUNITY SERVICES CORP OF WALTON COUNTY is a litigant