Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Walton County Courts on 08/05/2019 at 17:00:38 (UTC).

PATE, SALLY RUTH VS PATE, WILLIAM HENRY

Case Summary

On 07/12/2019 PATE, SALLY RUTH filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against PATE, WILLIAM HENRY. This case was filed in Walton County Courts, South Walton County Courthouse located in Walton, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WELLS, KELVIN C. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    07/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Walton County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    South Walton County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Walton, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WELLS, KELVIN C

 

Party Details

Petitioner

PATE, SALLY RUTH

Respondent

PATE, WILLIAM HENRY

Not Classified By Court

WATSON, SALLY RUTH

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/02/2019
  • NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • ACCEPTANCE AND WAIVER OF SERVICE, AND ANSWER:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • FAMILY LAW FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT OF: WILLIAM PATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • PROOF OF SERVICE TO WILLIAM HENRY PACE SERVED 07/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • ORDER OF REFERRAL TO GENERAL MAGISTRATE - CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • ORDER OF REFERRAL TO FAMILY MEDIATION UNIT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • FAMILY LAW STANDING PRETRIAL ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO: WILLIAM H. PATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • PHOTO IDENTIFICATION FILED (SALLY PATE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • AFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 07/12/2019
  • NOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • FAMILY MEDIATION INCOME VERIFICATION AFFIDAVIT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • PARTIES' INFORMATION SHEET;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION-NO MINOR CHILDREN OR PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • COVER SHEET FOR FAMILY COURT CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • COVER SHEET FOR FAMILY COURT CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF CIVIL INDIGENT STATUS- APPROVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF CIVIL INDIGENT STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • ASSESSMENT 2 ASSESSED AT SUM $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • ASSESSMENT 1 ASSESSED AT SUM $408.00

    Read MoreRead Less