Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Walton County Courts on 08/02/2019 at 17:02:07 (UTC).

PALMER, MARIANNE STROTHER VS PALMER, WILLIS EDWIN

Case Summary

On 07/09/2019 PALMER, MARIANNE STROTHER filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against PALMER, WILLIS EDWIN. This case was filed in Walton County Courts, South Walton County Courthouse located in Walton, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WELLS, KELVIN C. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Walton County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    South Walton County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Walton, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WELLS, KELVIN C

 

Party Details

Petitioner

PALMER, MARIANNE STROTHER

Respondent

PALMER, WILLIS EDWIN

Not Classified By Court

STROTHER, MARIANNE MORGAN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/01/2019
  • CERTIFICATE OF COMPLETION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • ORDER TO ATTEND DEPARTMENT OF CHILDREN AND FAMILIES APPROVED PARENT EDUCATION AND STABILIZATION COURSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • ORDER OF REFERRAL TO FAMILY MEDIATION UNIT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • FAMILY LAW STANDING PRETRIAL ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED: $408.00 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 118820

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • ASSESSMENT 1 ASSESSED AT SUM $408.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • FAMILY MEDIATION VERIFICATION AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • UNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION ENFORCEMENT AFFIDAVIT (UCCJEA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • DEMOGRAPHIC INFORMATION SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE AND RELATED RELIEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • COVER SHEET FOR FAMILY COURT CASES

    Read MoreRead Less