Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from First Circuit Courts - Walton County on 11/01/2019 at 14:32:01 (UTC).

OTANO, RAMON VS VERMILYA, BRIAN J Et Al

Case Summary

On 10/08/2019 OTANO, RAMON filed an Other lawsuit against VERMILYA, BRIAN J. This case was filed in First Circuit Courts - Walton County, Walton County Courthouse located in Walton, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is LEWIS, JEFFREY E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    10/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    First Circuit Courts - Walton County

  • Courthouse:

    Walton County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Walton, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

LEWIS, JEFFREY E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OTANO, RAMON

Defendants

VERMILYA, BRIAN J

YOUNGS CARGO INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Plaintiff Attorney

GOMEZ, CARLOS OMAR

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

10/08/2019:COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/14/2019
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO: BRIAN JAMES VERMILYA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2019
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO: YOUNGS CARGO INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED: $20.00 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 122805

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • ASSESSMENT 2 ASSESSED AT SUM $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • UNSIGNED SUMMONS TO YOUNGS CARGO INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • UNSIGNED SUMMONS TO BRIAN JAMES VERMILYA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT YOUNGS CARGO INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • NOTICE OF PROPOUNDING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT, YOUNGS CARGO INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT BRIAN JAMES VERMILYA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • NOTICE OF PROPOUNDING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT, BRIAN JAMES VERMILYA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED: $400.00 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 122721

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • ASSESSMENT 1 ASSESSED AT SUM $400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gomez, Carlos O.