This case was last updated from First Circuit Courts - Walton County on 08/11/2020 at 16:51:04 (UTC).

ORIGIN BANCORP, INC DBA ORIGIN VS WARREN, MELVIN JR Et Al

Case Summary

On 03/02/2020 ORIGIN BANCORP, INC DBA ORIGIN filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against WARREN, MELVIN JR. This case was filed in First Circuit Courts - Walton County, Walton County Courthouse located in Walton, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are LEWIS, JEFFREY E and LEWIS, JEFFREY EDWARD. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • County, State:

    Walton, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

LEWIS, JEFFREY E

LEWIS, JEFFREY EDWARD

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ORIGIN BANCORP, INC DBA ORIGIN

Defendants

WARREN, MELVIN JR

WARREN, MITCHELL

 

Court Documents

CERTIFIED MAIL RETURN RECEIPT TO MICHELLE WARREN

03/17/2020:CERTIFIED MAIL RETURN RECEIPT TO MICHELLE WARREN

MAIL RETURNED UNDELIVERED TO MELVIN WARREN JR

03/09/2020:MAIL RETURNED UNDELIVERED TO MELVIN WARREN JR

CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT ON MICHELL WARREN AND MELVIN WARREN JR

03/04/2020:CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT ON MICHELL WARREN AND MELVIN WARREN JR

NOTICE OF RECORDING AND CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

03/02/2020:NOTICE OF RECORDING AND CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

COPY AFFIDAVIT OF ORIGIN BANCORP INC, DBA ORIGIN BANK IN SUPPORT OF DOMESTICATION OF FOREIGN JUDGMENT

03/02/2020:COPY AFFIDAVIT OF ORIGIN BANCORP INC, DBA ORIGIN BANK IN SUPPORT OF DOMESTICATION OF FOREIGN JUDGMENT

CERTIFIED COPY OF AGREED FINAL JUDGMENT

03/02/2020:CERTIFIED COPY OF AGREED FINAL JUDGMENT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

03/02/2020:CIVIL COVER SHEET

LETTER TO CLERK

03/02/2020:LETTER TO CLERK

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFIED MAIL RETURN RECEIPT TO MICHELLE WARREN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMAIL RETURNED UNDELIVERED TO MELVIN WARREN JR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT ON MICHELL WARREN AND MELVIN WARREN JR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED: $442.00 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 127861

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF RECORDING AND CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOPY AFFIDAVIT OF ORIGIN BANCORP INC, DBA ORIGIN BANK IN SUPPORT OF DOMESTICATION OF FOREIGN JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFIED COPY OF AGREED FINAL JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER TO CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 ASSESSED AT SUM $442.00

    Read MoreRead Less