Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from First Circuit Courts - Walton County on 11/04/2019 at 14:33:19 (UTC).

MITCHEM, COLE VS SANDQUIST, LYLE J Et Al

Case Summary

On 10/11/2019 MITCHEM, COLE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against SANDQUIST, LYLE J. This case was filed in First Circuit Courts - Walton County, Walton County Courthouse located in Walton, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is LEWIS, JEFFREY E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    10/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    First Circuit Courts - Walton County

  • Courthouse:

    Walton County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Walton, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

LEWIS, JEFFREY E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MITCHEM, COLE

Defendants

SANDQUIST, SHERRY FLOYD

SANDQUIST, LYLE J

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BERRY, LANCE EDWARD

 

Court Documents

COMPLAIN WITH ATTACHED DISCOVERY

10/16/2019:COMPLAIN WITH ATTACHED DISCOVERY

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2019
  • REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; OF DOCUMENTS TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR ORDER TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF TO TIMELY INFORM DEFENDANT IF PLAINTIFF SCHEDULES SURGERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS FOR LYLE J. SANDQUIST AND SHERRY SANDQUIST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED: $420.00 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 122982

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO: SHERRY SANDQUIST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO: LYLE J SANDQUIST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • UNSIGNED SUMMONS TO SHERRY SANDQUIST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • UNSIGNED SUMMONS TO LYLE J SANDQUIST

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 10/16/2019
  • PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSION TO DEFENDANT SHERRY SANDQUIST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSION TO DEFENDANT LYLE SANDQUIST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT SHERRY SANDQUIST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT LYLE SANDQUIST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT SHERRY SANDQUIST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT LYLE SANDQUIST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAIN WITH ATTACHED DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • ASSESSMENT 2 ASSESSED AT SUM $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • ASSESSMENT 1 ASSESSED AT SUM $400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BERRY, LANCE EDWARD