Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Walton County Courts on 03/30/2021 at 16:03:31 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC VS REDMOND, CLAYTON

Case Summary

On 03/01/2021 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against REDMOND, CLAYTON. This case was filed in Walton County Courts, South Walton County Courthouse located in Walton, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are GREEN, DAVID WALKER and GREEN, DAVID W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Walton County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    South Walton County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Walton, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

GREEN, DAVID WALKER

GREEN, DAVID W

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendant

REDMOND, CLAYTON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHATANI, PAYAL YASHWANT

 

Court Documents

UNSIGNED SUMMONS /NOTICE TO APPEAR TO CLAYTON REDMOND

03/04/2021:UNSIGNED SUMMONS /NOTICE TO APPEAR TO CLAYTON REDMOND

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/11/2021
  • HearingEvent Date: 05/11/2021 10:30; Judge: GREEN, DAVID W; Docket Type: PT; Location: MAIN 3RD FL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE TO CLAYTON REDMOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUNSIGNED SUMMONS /NOTICE TO APPEAR TO CLAYTON REDMOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED: $185.00 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 140208

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 ASSESSED AT SUM $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Funding, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHATANI , PAYAL