This case was last updated from Walton County Courts on 03/27/2021 at 16:09:02 (UTC).

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC VS WAGONER, SHARON E

Case Summary

On 02/26/2021 MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against WAGONER, SHARON E. This case was filed in Walton County Courts, South Walton County Courthouse located in Walton, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are GREEN, DAVID WALKER and GREEN, DAVID W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Walton County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    South Walton County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Walton, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

GREEN, DAVID WALKER

GREEN, DAVID W

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC

Defendant

WAGONER, SHARON E

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FITZPATRICK, MOLLY KATHLEEN

 

Court Documents

UNSIGNED SUMMONS ISSUED SHARON E WAGONER

02/26/2021:UNSIGNED SUMMONS ISSUED SHARON E WAGONER

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/11/2021
  • HearingEvent Date: 05/11/2021 09:00; Judge: GREEN, DAVID W; Docket Type: PT; Location: MAIN 3RD FL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ISSUED TO SHARON E WAGONER ON MAY 11, 2021 AT 9:00 AM CST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUNSIGNED SUMMONS ISSUED SHARON E WAGONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED: $185.00 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 139978

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 ASSESSED AT SUM $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Credit Management, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FITZPATRICK, MOLLY KATHLEEN