This case was last updated from Walton County Courts on 06/13/2022 at 04:51:03 (UTC).

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC VS BARTON, DELORIS

Case Summary

On 08/06/2021 MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against BARTON, DELORIS. This case was filed in Walton County Courts, South Walton County Courthouse located in Walton, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are GREEN, DAVID WALKER and GREEN, DAVID W. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    08/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Walton, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

GREEN, DAVID WALKER

GREEN, DAVID W

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC

Defendant

BARTON, DELORIS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FITZPATRICK, MOLLY KATHLEEN

 

Court Documents

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

08/10/2021:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE TO DELORIS BARTON

08/12/2021:SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE TO DELORIS BARTON

PRE-TRIAL/FINAL HEARING MEMORANDUM;

11/09/2021:PRE-TRIAL/FINAL HEARING MEMORANDUM;

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/28/2022
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF JUDGEMENT TO DELORIS BARTON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketDEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketNON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAIVT OF MELISSA SMELTER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT AS TO COURT COSTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • HearingEvent Date: 11/09/2021 09:00; Judge: GREEN, DAVID W; Docket Type: PT; Location: MAIN 3RD FL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRE-TRIAL/FINAL HEARING MEMORANDUM;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRETRIAL HEARING TO ALL PARTIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE TO DELORIS BARTON ON 8/17/21

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE TO DELORIS BARTON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketUNSIGNED SUMMONS TO DELORES BARTON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED: $185.00 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 147005

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 ASSESSED AT SUM $185.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Credit Management, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FITZPATRICK, MOLLY KATHLEEN