This case was last updated from First Circuit Courts - Walton County on 09/21/2021 at 05:12:25 (UTC).

MIDFIRST BANK VS EAGLE BAY HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATI Et Al

Case Summary

On 02/02/2021 MIDFIRST BANK filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against EAGLE BAY HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATI. This case was filed in First Circuit Courts - Walton County, Walton County Courthouse located in Walton, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are WELLS, KELVIN CLYDE and WELLS, KELVIN C. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    02/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Walton, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

WELLS, KELVIN CLYDE

WELLS, KELVIN C

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDFIRST BANK

Defendants

EAGLE BAY MASTER ASSOCIATION I

UNKNOWN TENANT 1

UNKNOWN TENANT 2

EAGLE BAY HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATI

FOSTER, TARA C

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA DEPAR

FOSTER, SAMUEL G

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROSENBERG, ANNA JUDD

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF HEARING 9-22-21 AT 1:30 PM CST

06/11/2021:NOTICE OF HEARING 9-22-21 AT 1:30 PM CST

MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

06/04/2021:MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

PROOF OF PUBLICATION-NOTICE OF ACTION

04/21/2021:PROOF OF PUBLICATION-NOTICE OF ACTION

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING 9-22-21 AT 1:30 PM CST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL AS TO ATTORNEYS' TIME AND COSTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS/AMOUNT DUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketDEFAULT - ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY DEFENDANT (UNKNOWN TENANT 1; UNKNOWN TENANT 2)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketPROPOSED DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketMOTION AND REQUEST FOR DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketORIGINAL MORTGAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketUNSIGNED SUMMONS ISSUED TO UNKNOWN TENANT 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketUNSIGNED SUMMONS ISSUED TO UNKNOWN TENANT 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketUNSIGNED SUMMONS ISSUED TO: EAGLE BAY MASTER ASSOCIATION, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketUNSIGNED SUMMONS ISSUED TO: EAGLE BAY HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION OF NW FLORIDA, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketUNSIGNED SUMMONS ISSUED TO: SAMUEL G. FOSTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketUNSIGNED SUMMONS ISSUED TO: TARA C. FOSTER A/K/A TARA FOSTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketVALUE OF REAL PROPERTY/MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketMORTGAGE FORECLOSURE COMPLAINT AND ATTACHMENTS;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midfirst Bank is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROSENBERG, ANNA JUDD