This case was last updated from Walton County Courts on 03/30/2021 at 17:05:54 (UTC).

MAZAN, PAULA WEBB VS MCNEELY MAZAN, RONNIE R

Case Summary

On 03/02/2021 MAZAN, PAULA WEBB filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against MCNEELY MAZAN, RONNIE R. This case was filed in Walton County Courts, South Walton County Courthouse located in Walton, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WELLS, KELVIN CLYDE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Walton County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    South Walton County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Walton, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WELLS, KELVIN CLYDE

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MAZAN, PAULA WEBB

Respondent

MCNEELY MAZAN, RONNIE R

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

ADKINSON, CLAYTON J M

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketPROPOSED FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketFINAL DISPOSITION FORM;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketFAMILY LAW STANDING PRETRIAL ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED: $408.00 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 140116

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 ASSESSED AT SUM $408.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER (PAULA MAZAN)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketCOPY OF PETITIONER'S DRIVER'S LICENSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING PROOF OF RESIDENCY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketMARITAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketVERIFIED PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketCOVER SHEET FOR FAMILY COURT CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ADKINSON, CLAYTON J M