This case was last updated from First Circuit Courts - Walton County on 08/11/2020 at 21:31:30 (UTC).

MANYWEATHERS, MARLA D Et Al VS THE ESTATE OF LOIS JANE HARSTV Et Al

Case Summary

On 05/27/2020 MANYWEATHERS, MARLA D filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against THE ESTATE OF LOIS JANE HARSTV. This case was filed in First Circuit Courts - Walton County, Walton County Courthouse located in Walton, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are LEWIS, JEFFREY E and LEWIS, JEFFREY EDWARD. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    05/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Walton, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

LEWIS, JEFFREY E

LEWIS, JEFFREY EDWARD

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MANYWEATHERS, MARLA D

MANYWEATHERS, SIMON

Defendants

THE ESTATE OF LOIS JANE HARSTV

THE UNKNOWN HEIRS OF LOIS JANE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHONSON, ADAM MATTHEW

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED TO: KENNETH E HARSTVEDT

07/09/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED TO: KENNETH E HARSTVEDT

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/11/2020
  • DocketPROOF OF COMPLIANCE THE DEFUNIAK SPRINGS HERALD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TO KENNETH E HARSTVEDT 7-25-20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketEMAIL CONFIRMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO: DEBORAH A HARSTVEDT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO: KENNETH E HARSTVEDT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO: JAMES CHARLES HARSTVEDT JR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO: INGRID THERESE SYLVIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • DocketUNSIGNED SUMMONS TO KENNETH E HARSTVEDT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • DocketUNSIGNED SUMMONS TO JAMES CHARLES HARSTVEDT JR

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketAMENDED COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO: THE ESTATE OF LOIS JANE HARSTVEDT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO: THE UNKNOWN HEIRS OF LOIS JANE HARSTVEDT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED: $420.00 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 130469

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 ASSESSED AT SUM $420.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketUNSIGNED SUMMONS TO THE UNKNOWN HEIRS OF LOIS JANE HARSTVEDT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketUNSIGNED SUMMONS TO THE ESTATE OF JOIS JANE HARSTVEDT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Shonson, Adam Matthew