Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Walton County Courts on 03/30/2021 at 16:01:45 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING LLC VS PUTZ, BRADLEE

Case Summary

On 03/01/2021 LVNV FUNDING LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against PUTZ, BRADLEE. This case was filed in Walton County Courts, South Walton County Courthouse located in Walton, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are GREEN, DAVID WALKER and GREEN, DAVID W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Walton County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    South Walton County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Walton, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

GREEN, DAVID WALKER

GREEN, DAVID W

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV FUNDING LLC

Defendant

PUTZ, BRADLEE

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE TO BRADLEE PUTZ

03/02/2021:SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE TO BRADLEE PUTZ

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/11/2021
  • HearingEvent Date: 05/11/2021 09:30; Judge: GREEN, DAVID W; Docket Type: PT; Location: MAIN 3RD FL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE ON BRADLEE PUTZ ON 3/8/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE TO BRADLEE PUTZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED: $185.00 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 140073

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 ASSESSED AT SUM $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketUNSIGNED SUMMONS /NOTICE TO APPEAR TO BRADLEE PUTZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LVNV FUNDING LLC is a litigant