This case was last updated from Walton County Courts on 06/13/2022 at 04:48:12 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING LLC VS COTTON, KEVIN

Case Summary

On 08/17/2021 LVNV FUNDING LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against COTTON, KEVIN. This case was filed in Walton County Courts, South Walton County Courthouse located in Walton, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are GREEN, DAVID WALKER and GREEN, DAVID W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    08/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Walton, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

GREEN, DAVID WALKER

GREEN, DAVID W

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV FUNDING LLC

Defendant

COTTON, KEVIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SCHERR, HAROLD EARL

 

Court Documents

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

08/17/2021:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ISSUED TO KEVIN COTTON

08/18/2021:SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ISSUED TO KEVIN COTTON

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketCONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT AGAINGST SALARY OR WAGES FOR KEVIN COTTON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketCONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketREOPENED FOR CIVIL OTHER ON 4/27/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED: $85.00 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 157433

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketASSESSMENT 2 ASSESSED AT SUM $85.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • DocketMOTION FOR CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT AGAINST SALARY OR WAGES FOR KEVIN COTTON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • DocketReopen Date: 04/27/2022; Reopen Reason: Other reason

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • DocketCONSENT FINAL JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • HearingEvent Date: 11/09/2021 10:00; Judge: GREEN, DAVID W; Docket Type: PT; Location: MAIN 3RD FL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketPRE-TRIAL/FINAL HEARING MEMORANDUM;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRETRIAL HEARING TO ALL PARTIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE TO KEVIN COTTON ON 8/26/21

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ISSUED TO KEVIN COTTON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketUNSIGNED SUMMONS /NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE FOR KEVIN COTTON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED: $185.00 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 147329

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 ASSESSED AT SUM $185.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LVNV FUNDING LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCHERR, HAROLD EARL