This case was last updated from Walton County Courts on 06/14/2022 at 04:14:07 (UTC).

LINDSEY, KETURAH VS LINDSEY, NANCY E

Case Summary

On 08/23/2021 LINDSEY, KETURAH filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against LINDSEY, NANCY E. This case was filed in Walton County Courts, South Walton County Courthouse located in Walton, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WELLS, KELVIN CLYDE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • County, State:

    Walton, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WELLS, KELVIN CLYDE

 

Party Details

Petitioner

LINDSEY, KETURAH

Respondent

LINDSEY, NANCY E

Not Classified By Court

PARKER, KETURAH SHONDRELL

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/31/2022
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE TO NANCY LINDSEY 03/30/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT OF INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION AGAINST DOMESTIC VIOLENCE WITHOUT MINOR CHILD(REN) (AFTER NOTICE)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketLETTER FROM THE STATE ATTORNEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketLETTER TO STATE ATTORNEY FOR RO VIOLATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketPETITION BY AFFIDAVIT FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR A VIOLATION OF FINAL JUDGMENT OF INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION AGAINST DOMESTIC VIOLENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketSHERIFF INFORMATION SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketMAIL RETURNED UNDELIVERED KETURAH LINDSEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE TO NANCY LINDSEY ON 10/15/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketAMENDED TEMPORARY JUDGEMENT OF INJUNCITON FOR PROTECTION AGAINST DOMESTIC VIOLENCE WITHOUT MINOR CHILD(REN) (AFTER NOTICE)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE TO NANCY LINDSEY 9-1-21

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketTEMPORARY INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION AGAINST DOMESTIC VIOLENCE WITHOUT MINOR CHILD(REN)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE TO NANCY LINDSEY 8-24-21

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketORDER SETTING HEARING ON PETITION FOR INJUNCTION AGAINST DOMESTIC VIOLENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketUNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION ENFORCEMENT AFFIDAVIT (UCCJEA)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketSHERIFF INFORMATION SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketPHOTO IDENTIFICATION FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketRESTRAINING ORDER QUESTIONNAIRE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR INJUNCTION AGAINST DOMESTIC VIOLENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less