This case was last updated from Walton County - First Judicial Circuit Court on 07/22/2022 at 14:37:07 (UTC).

LEWIS, TAMMY VS GILLIES, AHREN Et Al

Case Summary

On 06/22/2022 LEWIS, TAMMY filed an Other lawsuit against GILLIES, AHREN. This case was filed in Walton County - First Judicial Circuit Court, Walton County Courthouse located in Walton, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are LEWIS, JEFFREY EDWARD and LEWIS, JEFFREY E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    06/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Walton, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

LEWIS, JEFFREY EDWARD

LEWIS, JEFFREY E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LEWIS, TAMMY

Defendants

PUBLIX SUPER MARKETS INC

GILLIES, AHREN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WILLIS, STEPHEN CLINTON

Defendant Attorney

GLUSMAN, JASON AARON

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

06/22/2022:COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET;

06/22/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET;

UNSIGNED SUMMONS TO PUBLIX SUPER MARKETS INC

06/22/2022:UNSIGNED SUMMONS TO PUBLIX SUPER MARKETS INC

UNSIGNED SUMMONS TO AHREN GILLIES

06/22/2022:UNSIGNED SUMMONS TO AHREN GILLIES

SUMMONS ISSUED TO: PUBLIX SUPER MARKETS, INC

06/22/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED TO: PUBLIX SUPER MARKETS, INC

SUMMONS ISSUED TO: AHREN GILLIES

06/22/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED TO: AHREN GILLIES

PROOF OF SERVICE TO PUBLIX SUPER MARETS, INC C/O CORPORATE CRESATIONS NETWORK, INC ON 06/23/2022

06/29/2022:PROOF OF SERVICE TO PUBLIX SUPER MARETS, INC C/O CORPORATE CRESATIONS NETWORK, INC ON 06/23/2022

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FILED BY PUBLIX SUPER MARKETS, INC.

07/06/2022:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FILED BY PUBLIX SUPER MARKETS, INC.

NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL

07/08/2022:NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANT, PUBLIX MARKETS, INC

07/08/2022:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANT, PUBLIX MARKETS, INC

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT, PUBLIX

07/08/2022:PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT, PUBLIX

PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT, PUBLIX SUPER MARKETS, INC.

07/08/2022:PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT, PUBLIX SUPER MARKETS, INC.

PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT, PUBLIX SUPER MARKETS, INC.

07/08/2022:PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT, PUBLIX SUPER MARKETS, INC.

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketDEFENDANT PUBLIX SUPER MARKETS, INC'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT, PUBLIX SUPER MARKETS, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT, PUBLIX SUPER MARKETS, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT, PUBLIX

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANT, PUBLIX MARKETS, INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE FILED BY PUBLIX SUPER MARKETS, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE TO PUBLIX SUPER MARETS, INC C/O CORPORATE CRESATIONS NETWORK, INC ON 06/23/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO: AHREN GILLIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO: PUBLIX SUPER MARKETS, INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUNSIGNED SUMMONS TO AHREN GILLIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUNSIGNED SUMMONS TO PUBLIX SUPER MARKETS INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED: $420.00 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 160321

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 ASSESSED AT SUM $420.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Publix Super Markets Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Glusman, Jason A, ESQ.