This case was last updated from First Circuit Courts - Walton County on 11/07/2019 at 14:31:30 (UTC).

LENNON, LISA Et Al VS TOWER HILL SELECT INSURANCE CO

Case Summary

On 10/14/2019 LENNON, LISA filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against TOWER HILL SELECT INSURANCE CO. This case was filed in First Circuit Courts - Walton County, Walton County Courthouse located in Walton, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is LEWIS, JEFFREY E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    10/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    First Circuit Courts - Walton County

  • Courthouse:

    Walton County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Walton, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

LEWIS, JEFFREY E

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LENNON, LISA

NORMAN, ARTHUR

Defendant

TOWER HILL SELECT INSURANCE CO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BASCO, NICHOLAS PETER

Defendant Attorney

FLUET, NICOLE MARIE

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

10/14/2019:COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/06/2019
  • REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLAINTIFFS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • NOTICE OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANT'S FIRST INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFFS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES BY NICOLE M FLUET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO: TOWER HILL SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED: $10.00 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 122939

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • ASSESSMENT 2 ASSESSED AT SUM $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • UNSIGNED SUMMONS TO TOWER HILL SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2019
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2019
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED: $400.00 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 122862

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2019
  • ASSESSMENT 1 ASSESSED AT SUM $400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Tower Hill Select Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer NICOLE MARIE FLUET