This case was last updated from First Circuit Courts - Walton County on 11/10/2019 at 14:35:03 (UTC).

LAKEVIEW LOAN SERVICING LLC VS PEREZ, JOSEPH THOMAS Et Al

Case Summary

On 10/21/2019 LAKEVIEW LOAN SERVICING LLC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against PEREZ, JOSEPH THOMAS. This case was filed in First Circuit Courts - Walton County, Walton County Courthouse located in Walton, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GREEN, DAVID W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    10/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    First Circuit Courts - Walton County

  • Courthouse:

    Walton County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Walton, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GREEN, DAVID W

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LAKEVIEW LOAN SERVICING LLC

Defendants

UNKNOWN TENANT 2 IN POSSESSION

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF JOSEPH THOMA

PEREZ, JOSEPH THOMAS

UNKNOWN TENANT 1 IN POSSESSION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COURNOYER, DEREK RAYMOND

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/05/2019
  • RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED ON UNKNOWN TENANT 2 IN POSSESSION OF THE PROPERTY ON 11/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED ON UNKNOWN TENANT 1 IN POSSESSION OF THE PROPERTY ON 11/02/2019 (OWNER OCCUPIED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED ON UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF JOSEPH THOMAS PEREZ ON 11/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED ON JOSEPH THOMAS PEREZ ON 11/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO: UNKNOWN TENANT #2 IN POSSESSION OF THE PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO: UNKNOWN TEANT #1 IN POSSESSION OF PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO: UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF JOSEPH THOMAS PEREZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO: JOSEPH THOMAS PEREZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED: $951.00 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 123197

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • ASSESSMENT 1 ASSESSED AT SUM $951.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • UNSIGNED SUMMONS UNKNOWN TENANT #2 IN POSSESSION OF THE PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • UNSIGNED SUMMONS UNKNOWN TENANT #1 IN POSSESSION OF THE PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • UNSIGNED SUMMONS UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF JOSEPH THOMAS PEREZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • UNSIGNED SUMMONS JOSEPH THOMAS PEREZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY/MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE COMPLAINT AND ATTACHMENTS;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer COURNOYER DEREK